Simplis et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank et al
Plaintiff: Frain Simplis and Lashondra Simplis
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, Transland Financial Services, Does 1-20, Washington Mutual Bank and All Persons claiming any interest in real property located at 864 Stonebridge Blvd, Savannah, GA 31405
Case Number: 4:2017cv00183
Filed: October 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: J. Randal Hall
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 JUDGMENT entered dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/24/19. (loh)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE for Plaintiffs failure to prosecute, failure to follow this Courts Orders, and failure to timely serve the Complaint. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to CLOSE this case. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/15/19. (jrb)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDERED that Plaintiff's are to show cause, in writing within 14 days from the date of this Order, why they have not timely served the remaining Defendants within 90 days as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(m). Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/25/18. (loh)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 12 Motion to Stay Pretrial and Discovery Deadlines; granting 15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to 11 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 11/15/17. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simplis et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frain Simplis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashondra Simplis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank
Represented By: Gregory R. Crochet
Represented By: Brian F. Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transland Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Persons claiming any interest in real property located at 864 Stonebridge Blvd, Savannah, GA 31405
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?