Barrett et al v. The Kemper Corporation
Plaintiff: Chester Barrett, James White, Mary White, Monroe Ford and Vertola Stubbs
Defendant: United Insurance Company of America, Inc. and The Kemper Corporation
Case Number: 4:2017cv00215
Filed: November 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Liberty
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Medicare Act
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/23/19. (jrb)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER reassigning case for plenary disposition to the Honorable R. Stan Baker. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/15/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (jlh) Modified on 10/15/2018 (jlh).
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 5 Motion to establish a briefing schedule. Defenants shall answer or respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 12/11/17. Plaintiff's shall respond to any motion to dismiss filed by Defendant on or before 1/19/18. Defendant's shall file any reply brief on or before 2/2/18. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 11/14/017. (jrb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrett et al v. The Kemper Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chester Barrett
Represented By: Robert Bartley Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James White
Represented By: Robert Bartley Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary White
Represented By: Robert Bartley Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monroe Ford
Represented By: Robert Bartley Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vertola Stubbs
Represented By: Robert Bartley Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Insurance Company of America, Inc.
Represented By: Taylor F. Brinkman
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Campbell
Represented By: Roger B. Cowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kemper Corporation
Represented By: Taylor F. Brinkman
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Campbell
Represented By: Roger B. Cowie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?