Admiral Insurance Company v. Center Contracting Company of Central Florida, LLC et al
Petitioner: Admiral Insurance Company
Respondent: Center Contracting Company of Central Florida, LLC, Contravest Management Company, Teressa Blondell, Alvin Blondell, RAM Partners, LLC and Richey Industries, Inc
Case Number: 4:2018cv00029
Filed: February 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 08/20/2019. (evk)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 51 Joint MOTION clarification on 50 Order on Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 06/18/2019. (evk)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting 48 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 05/20/2019. (evk)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying 38 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 04/17/2019. (evk)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 02/07/2019. (evk)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER dismissing as moot 15 Motion to Set Aside Default. Petitioner is DIRECTED to file and amended petition for declaratory relief within (14 days) from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 12/19/2018. (evs)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 30 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 06/19/2018. (evs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Admiral Insurance Company v. Center Contracting Company of Central Florida, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Admiral Insurance Company
Represented By: Melissa Lottie Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Center Contracting Company of Central Florida, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Contravest Management Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Teressa Blondell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Alvin Blondell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: RAM Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Richey Industries, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?