Peacock Automotive, LLC v. FCA US LLC

Plaintiff: Peacock Automotive, LLC
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00060
Filed: March 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Referring Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 47 Motion to Stay Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 2/19/19. (jrb)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER LIFTING STAY. (Joint proposed Order Compliance due by 2/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 1/15/19. (wwp)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER reassigning case for plenary disposition to the Honorable R. Stan Baker. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/15/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (jlh)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 40 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/22/18. (wwp)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 3/19/18. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peacock Automotive, LLC v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peacock Automotive, LLC
Represented By: John M. Brennan
Represented By: John W. Forehand
Represented By: Timothy D. Roberts
Represented By: R. Craig Spickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Richard K. Hines, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?