The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company v. Carolyn R. Rivon et al
Plaintiff: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Carolyn R. Rivon and Caretha Williams
Case Number: 4:2018cv00063
Filed: March 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDERED that the Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to disburse the interpleader funds deposited in the registry of the Court in the amount of $47,226.42, with any accrued interest, to Defendant Caretha Williams' counsel. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 8/12/19. (loh)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER dismissing as moot 23 Motion for Summary Judgment; 23 Motion for Extension of Time. In accordance with the agreement of the parties, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to disburse the interpleader funds to Defendant Caretha Williams' counsel. As requested by the parties, this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 8/8/19. (loh)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER dismissing Lincoln from the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 10/9/18. (wwp)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE/ORDER as to The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company v. Carolyn R. Rivon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kenton J. Coppage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn R. Rivon
Represented By: C. Dorian Britt
Represented By: Jeremy S. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caretha Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?