Lee v. City of Walthourville et al
Plaintiff: Latarshia Lee
Defendant: City of Walthourville and Daisy S. Pray
Case Number: 4:2018cv00090
Filed: April 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 JUDGMENT in favor of City of Walthourville against Latarshia Lee. This case is closed. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/27/20. (wwp)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 27 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to enter summary judgment in favor of the City and to CLOSE this case. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/24/20. (wwp)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 8 Motion to Dismiss. The Court dismisses all claims asserted against Defendant Pray and dismisses Plaintiff's claims for punitive damages. Plaintiff's other claims against Defendant City of Walthourville shall remain pending. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to terminate Daisy Pray as a named Defendant. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 1/28/19. (wwp)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 4/23/18. (loh)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. City of Walthourville et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latarshia Lee
Represented By: Charles Seaton Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Walthourville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daisy S. Pray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?