Jemme J. Jenkins, Individually, and Administrator of the Estate of Jimmie Lee Alexander, Sr. v. Corizon Health Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jemme J. Jenkins and Julianne Glisson
Defendant: Corizon Health Inc., Guy Augustin, Victoria Neilser, Kevin Todd, Mark Dambach, Carl Milton, Wanda Williams, Desmond Bryant, Chatham County Commissioners, Roy Harris, John Wilcher and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 4:2018cv00099
Filed: April 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER and NOTICE of Pretrial Proceedings. (Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/12/2020.) Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 10/13/2020. (pts)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER granting 117 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Deliberate Indifference, Punitive Damages, and Attorneys' Fees. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr. on 09/10/2020. (JH)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 118 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Guy Augustin; granting 119 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Mark Dambach; and granting 120 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Victoria Neisler. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr. on 09/03/2020. (JH)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER granting 123 Motion for Summary Judgment by Chatham County Commissioners. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr. on 08/27/2020. (JH)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER denying 122 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 8/22/2020. (pts)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER DISMISSING AS MOOT 121 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr. on 08/17/2020. (JH)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 127 Motion in Limine. Dr. Blais' causation opinion is not excluded; granting in part and denying in part 198 Motion to Strike. Dr. Blais may still testify about when the ischemic event began, to the extent permitted herein, but Dr. Blais cannot offer an opinion that the total occlusion occurred at 8:30 p.m. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 8/6/2020. (pts)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER dismissing re 134 Motion to Strike 99 Declaration of William Andrew Reese MD; dismissing re 174 Motion to Strike re 134 Affidavit of Tina Mostertz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 3/2/2020. (loh)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting 67 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Roy Harris is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr. on 02/19/2020. (JH)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 63 Consent Motion for Findings of Fact and 56 request for fees under Rule 37. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to confer with Correct Health within 14 days of service of this Order as to its demand for legal fees to compensate the costs of p reparing its response to the motion. Plaintiffs shall file a notice of stipulation to fees with the Court, or, if no agreement can be reached, Correct Health shall file evidence of its fees with the Court, within 21 days of service of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 04/03/2019. (evk)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying 43 Motion to Compel. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file a response to Correct Heatlth's request for fees within 14 days of service of this Order. If they do not oppose, they are ORDERED to confer with respondents to reach an agreement on costs and, within 14 days of service of this Order, file a notice of their stipulation to costs with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 03/18/2019. (evk)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 29 Motion to Compel; granting 30 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 08/31/2018. (evs)
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 05/01/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (evs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jemme J. Jenkins, Individually, and Administrator of the Estate of Jimmie Lee Alexander, Sr. v. Corizon Health Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jemme J. Jenkins
Represented By: Eugene C. Brooks, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julianne Glisson
Represented By: Eugene C. Brooks, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Inc.
Represented By: Thomas S. Carlock
Represented By: Eric J. Frisch
Represented By: Lauren E.H. Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guy Augustin
Represented By: Thomas S. Carlock
Represented By: Eric J. Frisch
Represented By: Lauren E.H. Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Neilser
Represented By: Thomas S. Carlock
Represented By: Eric J. Frisch
Represented By: Lauren E.H. Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Todd
Represented By: Jennifer R. Davenport
Represented By: R. Jonathan Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Dambach
Represented By: Thomas S. Carlock
Represented By: Eric J. Frisch
Represented By: Lauren E.H. Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Milton
Represented By: Jennifer R. Davenport
Represented By: R. Jonathan Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wanda Williams
Represented By: Jennifer R. Davenport
Represented By: R. Jonathan Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desmond Bryant
Represented By: Jennifer R. Davenport
Represented By: R. Jonathan Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chatham County Commissioners
Represented By: Jennifer R. Davenport
Represented By: R. Jonathan Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Harris
Represented By: Jennifer R. Davenport
Represented By: R. Jonathan Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wilcher
Represented By: Jennifer R. Davenport
Represented By: R. Jonathan Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?