Tsavaris v. Savannah Law School, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Maggie Tsavaris
Defendant: Savannah Law School, LLC, John Marshal Law School, LLC, John Marshal Law School, JMLS 1422, LLC, Michael C. Markowitz and Malcolm Morris
Case Number: 4:2018cv00125
Filed: May 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 73 Motion to Seal Document, Exhibits to 75 Reply to Response to Motion to be sealed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/3/19. (jrb)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 64 Motion to Seal Exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 9/17/19. (jrb)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 52 Motion to Seal Exhibits for 56 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 54 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 55 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/29/19. (jrb)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 47 Motion to Seal Document without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/24/2019. (pts)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying without prejudice 29 Motion to Quash Defendants' subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/13/19. (trb)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 30 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 05/03/2019. (evk)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER reassigning case for plenary disposition to the Honorable R. Stan Baker. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/15/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (jlh)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 General ORDER of pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 5/25/18. (Attachments: # 1 Notice) (wwp)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tsavaris v. Savannah Law School, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maggie Tsavaris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savannah Law School, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Marshal Law School, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Marshal Law School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JMLS 1422, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. Markowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?