Cooper et al v. Pierce Plaza, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Vanessa Cooper and Savannah-Chatham County Fair Housing Council, Inc.
Defendant: Pierce Plaza, LLC and Martin H. Bailey
Case Number: 4:2018cv00131
Filed: June 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: G. R. Smith
Presiding Judge: William T. Moore
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 23 Motion to Compel discovery; deferring ruling on 23 Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiff is Ordered to further supplement her discovery responses within 21 days of service of this Order to address each of the deficiencies identified in defendants' supplemental brief. The Clerk is directed to enclose an additional copy of defendants' supplemental briefing (doc 31) for plaintiff's use. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 5/13/19. (wwp) Modified on 5/13/2019 (wwp).
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER vacating 25 Order to show cause. Defendants are Ordered to file their response or reply apprising the Court of the sufficiency of plaintiff's discovery responses, as well as any request to withdraw their motion to compel and for mandatory fees, within 14 days of service of this Order. (Compliance due by 5/2/2019). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/18/19. (wwp)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file, within 14 days of service of this Order, a written response including the case caption and titled "Response to Order" stating whether she intends to further prosecute this case. (Compliance due by 4/16/2019). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/2/19. (wwp)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER dismissing the Savannah Chatham County Fair Housing Council with prejudice re 22 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Savannah-Chatham County Fair Housing Council, Inc. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 3/20/19. (wwp)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File the Joint Status Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 11/5/18. (wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper et al v. Pierce Plaza, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Cooper
Represented By: Matthew W. Dietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savannah-Chatham County Fair Housing Council, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew W. Dietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce Plaza, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin H. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?