Rauback v. City of Savannah et al
Plaintiff: John Rauback
Defendant: Greg Kelly, Savannah Airport Commission and City of Savannah
Case Number: 4:2018cv00167
Filed: July 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: G R Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 08/23/18. (sff)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Anita K. Balasubramanian Receipt Number 113J-2434220, Fee Amount $200, by John Rauback. Responses due by 9/5/2018. (Buckley, Edward)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 9/18/2018. Discovery due by 12/7/2018. Motions, Including Daubert Motions but Excluding Motions in Limine due by 1/6/2019. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 10/1/2018. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 10/31/2018. Status Report due by 10/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/6/18. (Attachments: #1 Civil Trial Information) (trb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2018: #2 Joint Status Instructions) (trb).
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Buckley, Edward)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE; granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 08/06/18. (sff)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rachel E. Berlin Receipt Number 113J-2423930, Fee Amount $200, by John Rauback. Responses due by 8/17/2018. (Buckley, Edward)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Brian J. Sutherland Receipt Number 113J-2423914, Fee Amount $200, by John Rauback. Responses due by 8/17/2018. (Buckley, Edward)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward D. Buckley on behalf of John Rauback. (Buckley, Edward) Modified on 8/2/2018 (trb).
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Litigants' Bill of Rights by City of Savannah. (Marlin, Quentin)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by City of Savannah.(Marlin, Quentin)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Greg Kelly, Savannah Airport Commission. (Herring, Wade)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Greg Kelly, Savannah Airport Commission. (Herring, Wade)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Greg Kelly and Savannah Airport Commission. (Herring, Wade) Modified on 7/18/2018 (trb).
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to All Counsel of Record re #1 Notice of Removal. (jrb)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General ORDER pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/16/18. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (jrb)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: City of Savannah answer due 7/20/2018; Greg Kelly answer due 7/20/2018; Savannah Airport Commission answer due 7/20/2018. (jrb)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Savannah Airport Commission and Greg Kelly from Superior Court of Chatham County, case number SPCV18-00535-WA. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113J-2410436), filed by Savannah Airport Commission and Greg Kelly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Superiour Court Complaint and Pleadings)(jrb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rauback v. City of Savannah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rauback
Represented By: Edward D. Buckley
Represented By: Anita K. Balasubramanian
Represented By: Rachel Berlin
Represented By: Brian J. Sutherland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Kelly
Represented By: Wade Wilkes Herring, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savannah Airport Commission
Represented By: Wade Wilkes Herring, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Savannah
Represented By: Quentin L. Marlin
Represented By: W. Brooks Stillwell, III
Represented By: Philip M. Thompson
Represented By: Jennifer N. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?