Bussey v. Bunch et al

Plaintiff: Isaac Bussey
Defendant: A&J Trucking of Alaska, LLC, Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company and Jeffrey D. Bunch
Case Number: 4:2018cv00179
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
0 Judge: R Stan Baker
1 Judge: G R Smith
2 Judge: Lisa G Wood
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2018 21 Litigants' Bill of Rights by A&J Trucking of Alaska, LLC. (Rahimi, Joseph)
September 24, 2018 20 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by A&J Trucking of Alaska, LLC. (Rahimi, Joseph)
September 24, 2018 19 ANSWER to Complaint by A&J Trucking of Alaska, LLC.(Rahimi, Joseph)
September 20, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Waiver of Service due by 11/16/2018. (evs)
September 20, 2018 18 Featured Case ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 09/20/2018. (evs)
September 19, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Service of Defendant Jeffrey D. Bunch. (evs)
September 17, 2018 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Service of Defendant Jeffrey D. Bunch by Isaac Bussey. Responses due by 10/1/2018. (McDonald, Karen) Modified on 9/18/2018 (evs). Modified on 9/19/2018 (jlh).
September 13, 2018 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Isaac Bussey. A&J Trucking of Alaska, LLC served on 9/4/2018, answer due 9/25/2018. (McDonald, Karen)
September 4, 2018 15 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge R. Stan Baker for all further proceedings. Judge Lisa G. Wood no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 9/4/18. (jrb)
August 30, 2018 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena (Pooler Imaging Center) served on Crystal Maybrie on 09/30/2018, filed by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company. (Rahimi, Joseph)
August 30, 2018 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena (Ortho Sport and Spine) served on Larissa Brown on 08/29/2018, filed by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company. (Rahimi, Joseph)
August 30, 2018 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena (Memorial Hospital) served on Sarah Puetz on 08/29/2018, filed by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company. (Rahimi, Joseph)
August 30, 2018 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena (ED Trucking) served on Erica Dukes, Manager on 08/29/2018, filed by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company. (Rahimi, Joseph)
August 22, 2018 10 Summons Issued as to A&J Trucking of Alaska, LLC and Jeffrey D. Bunch. (evs)
August 22, 2018 9 Summons Submitted. (McDonald, Karen) Modified on 8/22/2018 (evs).
August 16, 2018 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Rahimi, Joseph)
August 15, 2018 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company. (Rahimi, Joseph)
August 9, 2018 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen McDonald on behalf of Isaac Bussey. (McDonald, Karen) Modified on 8/10/2018 (evs).
August 2, 2018 5 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company. (Rahimi, Joseph)
August 2, 2018 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company.(Rahimi, Joseph)
July 30, 2018 3 Featured Case General ORDER pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/30/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (wwp)
July 30, 2018 2 NOTICE to all counsel that a #1 Notice of Removal was filed in the Southern District of Georgia. Set/Reset Deadlines: Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company answer due 8/3/2018. Compliance due by 8/9/2018. State Court Motions due by 8/13/2018. (wwp)
July 27, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company from State Court of Chatham County, case number STCV1800983, State Court Complaint enclosed (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J-2419272), filed by Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, Summons, #3 Exhibit B, Notice of Filing).(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bussey v. Bunch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&J Trucking of Alaska, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Y. Rahimi, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway Homestate Insurance Company
Represented By: Joseph Y. Rahimi, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey D. Bunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Bussey
Represented By: Karen McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?