Doe v. Savannah-Chatham County Public School System et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1
Defendant: Savannah-Chatham County Public School System and Marvin T. Johnson
Case Number: 4:2018cv00180
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
County: Chatham
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: G R Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave of Absence. The attorney must make arrangements for other counsel to appear in the event the case is scheduled for hearing or trial during such leave. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 09/11/18. (sff)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Marvin T. Johnson for dates of : October 11-15 2018, December 28 2018-January 7 2019, February 22 - March 4 2019, March 29 - April 11 2019 by Marvin T. Johnson. Responses due by 9/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Buckley, Timothy)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/5/2018. Discovery due by 12/24/2018. Motions due by 1/23/2019. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 10/14/2018. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 11/13/2018. Status Report due by 11/4/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/28/18. (Attachments: #1 Civil Information, #2 Status) (wwp)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hensel, Taylor)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Marvin T. Johnson. (Buckley, Timothy)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel LeCraw Mikell on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Mikell, Samuel) Modified on 8/15/2018 (wwp).
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Jane Doe 1. (Savage, Brent)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent J. Savage on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Savage, Brent) Modified on 8/10/2018 (wwp).
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Jane Doe 1. (Savage, Brent)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Durham on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Durham, James) Modified on 8/9/2018 (wwp).
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Not at this address. Unable to forward. Johnson represented by attorney's Buckley and Henzel. Documents #2 and #3 sent electronically to counsel for Johnson. (wwp)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Marvin T. Johnson. (Hensel, Taylor)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint Amended Complaint by Marvin T. Johnson.(Hensel, Taylor)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Amended) by Savannah-Chatham County Public School System.(Dekle, Andrew)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor W. Hensel on behalf of Marvin T. Johnson. (Hensel, Taylor) Modified on 8/1/2018 (wwp).
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Buckley, III on behalf of Marvin T. Johnson. (Buckley, Timothy) Modified on 8/1/2018 (wwp).
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Savannah-Chatham County Public School System. (Dekle, Andrew)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Statement of Motions Pending by SCCPSS. (Dekle, Andrew)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Savannah-Chatham County Public School System. (Dekle, Andrew)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 7/30/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (loh)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #1 Notice of Removal. (loh)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: State Court Motion Deadline due by 8/6/2018. (wwp) Modified on 7/30/2018 (wwp).
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Savannah-Chatham County Public School System from State Court of Chatham County, case number STCV1800734. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 113J-2419551), filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Summons and Notice, #3 Exhibit C-Answer, #4 Exhibit D-Motion to Dismiss, #5 Exhibit E-Stipulation, #6 Exhibit F-Answer of Marvin T. Johnson, #7 Exhibit G-Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit H-Response to Motion to Dismiss, #9 Exhibit I-Consent to Removal, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Savannah-Chatham County Public School System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe 1
Represented By: Brent J. Savage
Represented By: James D. Durham
Represented By: Samuel LeCraw Mikell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savannah-Chatham County Public School System
Represented By: Leamon Roy Holliday, III
Represented By: Andrew Harrison Dekle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin T. Johnson
Represented By: Timothy J. Buckley, III
Represented By: Taylor W. Hensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?