June 22, 2020 |
Filing 77
ORDER granting re #76 Motion to Dismiss. As requested by the parties, this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 6/22/2020. (loh)
|
June 18, 2020 |
Filing 76
Joint MOTION to Dismiss (Settlement Has Been Reached) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 7/2/2020. (Cunningham, Xavier)
|
April 17, 2020 |
Filing 75
ORDER granting re #70 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Claimant LKQs First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production of Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/17/2020. (loh)
|
April 17, 2020 |
Filing 74
ORDER granting re #73 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/17/2020. (loh)
|
April 17, 2020 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response re #75 Order due by 6/19/2020. (loh)
|
April 16, 2020 |
Filing 73
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #71 Scheduling Order, by 1550 Automotive Grilles, Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc., LKQ Corporation. Responses due by 4/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Irwin, Barry)
|
April 16, 2020 |
Filing 72
RESPONSE to Motion re #70 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Claimant LKQs First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production of Documents , filed by 1550 Automotive Grilles, Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc., LKQ Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Irwin, Barry)
|
April 16, 2020 |
MOTIONS REFERRED: #73 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #71 Scheduling Order. (jrb)
|
April 14, 2020 |
Filing 71
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/10/2020. Discovery due by 11/23/2020. Motions due by 12/21/2020. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 9/30/2020. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 10/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/14/20. (Attachments: #1 Trial Information) (jrb) Modified on 4/14/2020 (ca).
|
April 13, 2020 |
MOTIONS REFERRED: #70 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Claimant LKQs First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production of Documents. , (jrb)
|
April 10, 2020 |
Filing 70
MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Claimant LKQs First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production of Documents , by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 4/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Xavier)
|
March 12, 2020 |
Filing 69
ORDERED that the order of the United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit is made the order of this Court. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 3/12/2020. (loh)
|
March 10, 2020 |
Filing 68
MANDATE of USCA as to #40 Notice of Appeal filed by FCA US LLC. (jrb)
|
January 23, 2020 |
Filing 67
NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (JOINTLY PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER) (Cunningham, Xavier)
|
January 15, 2020 |
Filing 66
Appeal Opinion re #40 Notice of Appeal: Opinion issued by court as to Appellant FCA US LLC. Decision: Dismissed. (jrb)
|
December 13, 2019 |
Filing 65
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on November 18, 2019, before Judge Christopher L. Ray. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Victoria L. Root, CCR; Telephone Number: (912) 650-4066; Tape Number: FTR. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (Transcript Redaction Policy Issued or Click here to view
|
December 12, 2019 |
Filing 64
ORDER denying #57 Motion to Stay. The parties are DIRECTED to confer within thirty days of the date of this Order and propose a schedule for discovery and dispositive motions. Within fourteen days of their conference, the parties should submit a joint status report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 12/12/19. (jrb)
|
December 12, 2019 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 1/11/2020. (jrb)
|
November 18, 2019 |
Filing 63
TEXT ONLY ORDER taking under advisement #57 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/18/2019. (MD)
|
November 18, 2019 |
Filing 62
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray: Motion Hearing held on 11/18/2019 re #57 MOTION to Stay filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. The motion was TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT with a written ruling to follow. (Tape #FTR - SAV.) (MD)
|
November 6, 2019 |
Filing 61
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #57 MOTION to Stay : Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2019 01:30 PM in Savannah - Mag Jud Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray. (MD)
|
November 6, 2019 |
Filing 60
ORDER granting #59 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/06/2019. (MD)
|
November 4, 2019 |
Filing 59
MOTION for Hearing on the Government's Motion to Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 11/18/2019. (Cunningham, Xavier)
|
October 21, 2019 |
Filing 58
RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Stay filed by 324 Automotive Grilles, Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc., LKQ Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Irwin, Barry)
|
October 7, 2019 |
Filing 57
MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Xavier)
|
October 3, 2019 |
Filing 56
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by 324 Automotive Grilles, Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc., LKQ Corporation.(Irwin, Barry)
|
September 19, 2019 |
Filing 54
AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second Amended Verified Complaint) against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Clerk's Arrest Warrant)(Cunningham, Xavier)
|
September 12, 2019 |
Filing 52
ORDER dismissing as moot without prejudice #43 Motion for Hearing; granting in part and denying in part #46 Motion to Amend Complaint; dismissing as moot without prejudice #14 Motion to Dismiss. The Government is directed and ordered to file a Second Amended Complaint in this case within seven days. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 9/12/19. (jrb)
|
September 12, 2019 |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 9/19/2019. (jrb)
|
September 10, 2019 |
Filing 51
REPLY to Response to Motion re #46 MOTION to Amend/Correct Amended Complaint and MOTION to Withdraw Motions to Dismiss filed by 324 Automotive Grilles, Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc., LKQ Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DDC MtD Order, #2 Exhibit B - Minn Exclusion Letters, #3 Exhibit C - DDC Corrected Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - FPF Seizures Table)(Irwin, Barry)
|
September 5, 2019 |
Filing 50
NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (STATUS REPORT) (Cunningham, Xavier)
|
August 29, 2019 |
Filing 49
ORDER granting #45 Motion for Leave of Absence for attorney Xavier Cunningham for the dates of August 12, 2019 to August 21, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/29/19. (jrb)
|
August 27, 2019 |
Filing 48
RESPONSE, RESPONSE to Motion re #46 MOTION to Amend/Correct Amended Complaint and MOTION to Withdraw Motions to Dismiss filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Cunningham, Xavier)
|
August 16, 2019 |
Filing 47
REPLY to Response to Motion re #43 MOTION for Hearing re #14 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue Transfer and Combined Memorandum in Support [PUBLIC] [REDACTED} filed by 324 Automotive Grilles, 60 Automotive Grilles, Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc., LKQ Corporation. (Irwin, Barry)
|
August 13, 2019 |
Filing 46
MOTION to Amend/Correct Amended Complaint and, MOTION to Withdraw Motions to Dismiss by 324 Automotive Grilles, Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc., LKQ Corporation. Responses due by 8/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Irwin, Barry)
|
August 12, 2019 |
MOTIONS REFERRED: #45 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for dates of : August 12, 2019 to August 21, 2019. (jrb)
|
August 9, 2019 |
Filing 45
MOTION for Leave of Absence as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for dates of : August 12, 2019 to August 21, 2019 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Responses due by 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Xavier)
|
August 2, 2019 |
Filing 44
RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION for Hearing re #14 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue Transfer and Combined Memorandum in Support [PUBLIC] [REDACTED} filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Cunningham, Xavier)
|
July 19, 2019 |
Filing 43
MOTION for Hearing re #14 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue Transfer and Combined Memorandum in Support [PUBLIC] [REDACTED} by 324 Automotive Grilles, Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc., LKQ Corporation. Responses due by 8/2/2019. (Irwin, Barry)
|
July 5, 2019 |
F.R.A.P. Certificate of Readiness re #40 Notice of Appeal. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (evk)
|
May 31, 2019 |
Filing 42
USCA Case Number 19-12023-HH for #40 Notice of Appeal filed by FCA US LLC. (trb)
|
May 24, 2019 |
Filing 41
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re: #40 Notice of Appeal. Other Appeals: No. Judge Appealed: William T. Moore. Fee Paid: Yes. Pending COA/IFP: No. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(trb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/30/2019: #2 Docket Sheet) (trb).
|
May 23, 2019 |
Filing 40
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #38 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion to Withdraw by FCA US LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 113J-2609913. (Powell, Judith)
|
May 3, 2019 |
Filing 39
Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (cmr)
|
March 25, 2019 |
Filing 38
ORDER denying #26 Motion to Intervene; granting #37 Motion to Withdraw LKQ's Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 3/25/19. (trb)
|
March 4, 2019 |
Filing 37
MOTION to Withdraw #14 MOTION to Dismiss and Change Venue, Transfer, and Combined Memorandum in Support [PUBLIC] [REDACTED} by 324 Automotive Grilles, Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc., LKQ Corporation. Responses due by 3/18/2019. (Irwin, Barry)
|
February 28, 2019 |
Filing 36
RESPONSE to #35 Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of FCA's Motion to Intervene filed by Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc., LKQ Corporation. (Irwin, Barry) Modified on 3/1/2019 (trb).
|
February 25, 2019 |
Filing 35
NOTICE by FCA US LLC re #26 MOTION to Intervene Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of FCA's Motion to Intervene (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Powell, Judith)
|
February 5, 2019 |
Filing 34
SUR REPLY re #26 MOTION to Intervene filed by 324 Automotive Grilles, Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc., LKQ Corporation. (Irwin, Barry)
|
January 28, 2019 |
Filing 33
ORDER granting #30 Motion to Seal Exhibit 1 to #31 Reply to Response to Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 1/25/19. (trb)
|
January 23, 2019 |
Filing 32
NOTICE of Intent to file a a sur-reply by 324 Automotive Grilles, Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc., LKQ Corporation re #31 Reply to Response to Motion. (Irwin, Barry)
|
January 23, 2019 |
MOTIONS REFERRED: #30 MOTION to Seal Document . (trb)
|
January 22, 2019 |
Filing 31
REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Intervene filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Powell, Judith) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/28/2019: #2 Sealed Exhibit) (trb).
|
January 22, 2019 |
Filing 30
MOTION to Seal Document by FCA US LLC. Responses due by 2/5/2019. (Powell, Judith)
|
January 9, 2019 |
Filing 29
RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION to Intervene filed by 324 Automotive Grilles, Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc., LKQ Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B1, #4 Exhibit B2)(Irwin, Barry)
|
January 8, 2019 |
Filing 28
ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 1/8/19. (trb)
|
January 8, 2019 |
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray. Magistrate Judge James E. Graham no longer assigned to the case. (loh)
|
January 4, 2019 |
Filing 27
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for (Judith A. Powell) Receipt Number 113J-2510841, Fee Amount $200, by FCA US LLC. Responses due by 1/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Application and Proposed Order)(Reeves, Mark) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/7/2019: #2 Federal Certificate of Good Standing) (loh).
|
January 2, 2019 |
Motions No Longer Referred: #26 MOTION to Intervene (jgb)
|
December 26, 2018 |
Filing 26
MOTION to Intervene by FCA US LLC. Responses due by 1/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Memorandum of FCA US LLC in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Reeves, Mark)
|
December 26, 2018 |
MOTIONS REFERRED: #26 MOTION to Intervene . (trb)
|
December 12, 2018 |
Filing 25
AMENDED #13 Defendants' Verified Claim Pursuant to Supplemental Rule G(5)(a)(ii). (Dekle, Andrew) Modified on 12/13/2018 (trb).
|
November 19, 2018 |
Filing 24
SUR REPLY re #14 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue Transfer and Combined Memorandum in Support [PUBLIC] [REDACTED} filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Cunningham, Xavier)
|
November 14, 2018 |
Filing 23
NOTICE of Intent to FILE A SUR-RELY BRIEF by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Cunningham, Xavier)
|
November 5, 2018 |
Filing 22
REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue Transfer and Combined Memorandum in Support [PUBLIC] [REDACTED} Reply to Government's Response re #19 filed by 324 Automotive Grilles, Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc., LKQ Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit J, #2 Exhibit K, #3 Exhibit L, #4 Exhibit M, #5 Exhibit N, #6 Exhibit O, #7 Exhibit P)(Irwin, Barry)
|
October 23, 2018 |
Filing 21
NOTICE of Intent to File Reply Brief by 324 Automotive Grilles, 60 Automotive Grilles, Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc., LKQ Corporation re #19 Response in Opposition to Motion,. (Dekle, Andrew)
|
October 22, 2018 |
Filing 20
DECLARATION of Publication by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cunningham, Xavier)
|
October 22, 2018 |
Filing 19
RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Change Venue Transfer and Combined Memorandum in Support [PUBLIC] [REDACTED} filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Xavier)
|
October 9, 2018 |
Filing 18
Litigants' Bill of Rights by 324 Automotive Grilles, Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc., LKQ Corporation. (Dekle, Andrew)
|
October 9, 2018 |
Filing 17
TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE; granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE; granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 10/09/18. (sff)
|
October 8, 2018 |
Filing 16
Corporate Disclosure Statement by 324 Automotive Grilles, Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc., LKQ Corporation identifying LKQ Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (Dekle, Andrew)
|
October 8, 2018 |
Filing 15
ENTERED IN ERROR, Modified on 10/9/2018 (jgb). Modified on 10/10/2018 (trb).
|
October 8, 2018 |
Filing 14
******* MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Change Venue Transfer and Combined Memorandum in Support [PUBLIC] [REDACTED} by 324 Automotive Grilles, 60 Automotive Grilles, LKQ Corporation, Keystone Automotive Industries, Inc.. Responses due by 10/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Del. Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Irwin Dec, #3 Exhibit C- Asserted Grilles Table, #4 Exhibit D- Union Pacific Order, #5 Exhibit E- Email from Welk, #6 Exhibit F- McKenna Dec, #7 Exhibit G- Jude Dec, #8 Exhibit G1- Jude Dec, #9 Exhibit G2- Jude Dec, #10 Exhibit G3- Jude Dec, #11 Exhibit G4- Jude Dec, #12 Exhibit G5-Jude Dec, #13 Exhibit G6- Jude Dec Redacted, #14 Exhibit G7- Jude Dec. Redacted, #15 Exhibit G8- Jude Dec., #16 Exhibit G9-Jude Dec., #17 Exhibit H- ASA Statute Summary, #18 Exhibit I- NAIC Compendium)(Dekle, Andrew)
|
October 8, 2018 |
Filing 13
NOTICE of Filing by 324 Automotive Grilles Defendant's Verified Claim Pursuant to Supplemental Rule G(5)(a)(ii) (Dekle, Andrew)
|
October 8, 2018 |
Filing 12
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Reid P Huefner Receipt Number 113J-2460727, Fee Amount $200, by 324 Automotive Grilles. Responses due by 10/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Dekle, Andrew)
|
October 8, 2018 |
Filing 11
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Christopher D. Eggert Receipt Number 113J-2460726, Fee Amount $200, by 324 Automotive Grilles. Responses due by 10/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Dekle, Andrew)
|
October 8, 2018 |
Filing 10
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Barry F. Irwin Receipt Number 113J-2460724, Fee Amount $200, by 324 Automotive Grilles. Responses due by 10/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Dekle, Andrew)
|
October 8, 2018 |
Filing 9
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Harrison Dekle on behalf of 324 Automotive Grilles (Dekle, Andrew)
|
October 8, 2018 |
Filing 8
NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Michael Baiad on behalf of 324 Automotive Grilles (Baiad, Todd)
|
September 12, 2018 |
Filing 7
U.S. Marshal Return as to 324 Automotive Grilles for 5 Seizure Warrant Issued, #4 Amended Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Cunningham, Xavier)
|
September 12, 2018 |
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Compliance due by 10/15/2018. (trb)
|
September 10, 2018 |
Filing 6
NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re: Notice of Forfeiture (Cunningham, Xavier)
|
September 7, 2018 |
Filing 4
AMENDED COMPLAINT against 60 Automotive Grilles, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Warrant for Arrest)(Cunningham, Xavier)
|
August 23, 2018 |
Filing 3
U.S. Marshal Return as to 60 Automotive Grilles for #1 Complaint filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, #2 Warrant Issued (Cunningham, Xavier)
|
August 20, 2018 |
Filing 2
WARRANT For Arrest of Personal Property IN REM issued. (jrb)
|
August 17, 2018 |
Filing 1
Verified COMPLAINT for Forfeiture IN REM against 60 Automotive Grilles, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jrb)
|