Securities and Exchange Commission v. Dorrance
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Robert William Dorrance
Case Number: 4:2018cv00209
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: James E Graham
2 Judge: William T Moore
3 Judge: G R Smith
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Graham pursuant to the standing order in 4:18-mc-16. Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (slt)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge R. Stan Baker for all further proceedings. Judge William T. Moore, Jr. no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 10/15/2018. (pts)
September 5, 2018 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Robert William Dorrance, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Sullivan, Edward)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 General ORDER pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 8/31/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (jrb)
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Robert William Dorrance. (jrb)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 Certificate of Related Cases 3.1 by Securities and Exchange Commission. (jrb)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 Consent of Defendant Robert William Dorrance. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Judgment)(jrb)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Securities and Exchange Commission. (jrb)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert William Dorrance, filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Counsel Refiled or Related Cases LR 3.1)(jrb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2018: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jrb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Dorrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert William Dorrance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Edward Gary Sullivan
Represented By: Brian M. Basinger
Represented By: John Thomas Clarkson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?