COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. Roberts et al

Plaintiff: COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: Brady King and Brittany Roberts
Case Number: 4:2018cv00230
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
0 Judge: James E Graham
1 Judge: William T Moore
2 Judge: G R Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Graham. Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (wwp)
October 2, 2018 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Brady King waiver sent on 9/27/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. (Traynham, Jay)
September 28, 2018 6 NOTICE to all counsel of record that a #1 Complaint was transferred to the Southern District of Georgia, Savannah Division from the Brunswick Division. (wwp)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 General ORDER pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/28/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (wwp)
September 28, 2018 Case reassigned to Judge William T. Moore, Jr. and Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith. Judge Lisa G. Wood, Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro no longer assigned to the case. Intra-district transfer of case. (slt)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Change Venue. Case is transferred from Brunswick Division to Savannah Division. Signed by Judge Lisa G. Wood on 9/28/18. (slt)
September 26, 2018 3 MOTION to Change Venue (Transfer to the Savannah Division) by COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. Responses due by 10/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Traynham, Jay)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 9/25/18. (slt)
September 25, 2018 Filing fee: $400, receipt number 113J-2453510. (slt)
September 25, 2018 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Brady King, Brittany Roberts, filed by COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(slt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2018: #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C Part 1, #5 Exhibit C Part 2, #6 Exhibit C Part 3, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (slt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brady King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brittany Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COUNTRY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Amanda Rodman Smith
Represented By: Jay C. Traynham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?