Altamaha Riverkeeper et al v. The United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Plaintiff: One Hundred Miles, Altamaha Riverkeeper and Center for a Sustainable Coast, Inc.
Defendant: Tunis McElwain, Lt. General Todd T. Semonite, Col. Daniel Hibner and The United States Army Corps of Engineers
Intervenor Defendant: Sea Island Acquisition, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00251
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: James E Graham
2 Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint of Center for a Sustainable Coast, Inc. by Sea Island Acquisition, LLC.(Durham, James)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave of Absence. The attorney must make arrangements for other counsel to appear in the event the case is scheduled for hearing or trial during such leave. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 12/21/18. (sff)
December 21, 2018 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Center for a Sustainable Coast, Inc. for dates of : January 17, 18 and 21, 2019; February 18 through and including February 22, 2019; April 1 through and including April 5, 2019; May 14 through May 17, 2019; July 9 through July 12, 2019; September 10 through September 13, 2019; November 12 through November 15, 2019; and January 13 through January 16, 2020. by Center for a Sustainable Coast, Inc.. Responses due by 1/4/2019. (Sturm, Kimberly)
December 19, 2018 Filing 27 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Sea Island Acquisition, LLC. (Durham, James)
December 19, 2018 Filing 26 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Sea Island Acquisition, LLC. (Durham, James)
December 19, 2018 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint by Sea Island Acquisition, LLC.(Durham, James)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting re #12 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 12/19/18. (loh)
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting #15 Motion to Expedite; denying #19 Motion for Hearing; finding as moot #21 Motion. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 12/10/2018. (pts)
December 3, 2018 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #21 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction filed by Daniel Hibner, Tunis McElwain, Todd T. Semonite, The United States Army Corps of Engineers. (Mann, Martha)
November 30, 2018 Filing 21 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction by Altamaha Riverkeeper, One Hundred Miles. Re: #5 . Responses due by 12/14/2018. (Sapp, William) Modified on 11/30/2018 (jrb).
November 28, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: entered in error. Modified on 11/28/2018 (ca).
November 21, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #15 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Daniel Hibner, Tunis McElwain, Todd T. Semonite, The United States Army Corps of Engineers. (Mann, Martha)
November 21, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Sea Island Acquisition, LLC. Responses due by 12/5/2018. (Barmeyer, Patricia)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 11/21/18. (sff)
November 20, 2018 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Altamaha Riverkeeper, One Hundred Miles. (Sapp, William)
November 20, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Intervene filed by Altamaha Riverkeeper, One Hundred Miles. (Sapp, William)
November 20, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Altamaha Riverkeeper, One Hundred Miles. Responses due by 12/4/2018. (Sapp, William)
November 20, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Randy J. Butterfield Receipt Number 113J-2487182, Fee Amount $200, by Sea Island Acquisition, LLC. Responses due by 12/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Durham, James)
November 20, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION to Intervene. (wwp)
November 19, 2018 Filing 13 Brief in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Daniel Hibner, Tunis McElwain, The United States Army Corps of Engineers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Curteman, Dedra)
November 16, 2018 Filing 12 ******* MOTION to Intervene by Sea Island Acquisition, LLC. Responses due by 11/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Answer, #2 Exhibit Disclosure Statement, #3 Exhibit Litigants' Bill of Rights, #4 Exhibit Motion Seeking Due Date for Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Barmeyer, Patricia)
November 12, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Intent to file Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Daniel Hibner, Tunis McElwain, Todd T. Semonite, The United States Army Corps of Engineers. Re: #5 (Mann, Martha) Modified on 11/16/2018 (jrb).
November 12, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha Mann on behalf of All Defendants. (Mann, Martha) Modified on 11/15/2018 (wwp).
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants (Curteman, Dedra)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 11/06/18. (sff)
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2475399, Fee Amount $200, by Altamaha Riverkeeper, One Hundred Miles. Responses due by 11/15/2018. (Sapp, William)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge J. Randal Hall for all further proceedings. District Judge R. Stan Baker no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 11/1/18. (wwp)
November 1, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Receipt Number 113J-2475399, Fee Amount $200. (wwp)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Altamaha Riverkeeper, One Hundred Miles. Responses due by 11/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S)(Sapp, William)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Altamaha Riverkeeper, One Hundred Miles. (Sapp, William)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 10/31/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (loh)
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Daniel Hibner, Tunis McElwain, Todd T. Semonite, The United States Corps of Engineers. (loh)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Altamaha Riverkeeper, One Hundred Miles. Receipt # 113J-2474376 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altamaha Riverkeeper et al v. The United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tunis McElwain
Represented By: Dedra Seibel Curteman
Represented By: Martha Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. General Todd T. Semonite
Represented By: Dedra Seibel Curteman
Represented By: Martha Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Col. Daniel Hibner
Represented By: Dedra Seibel Curteman
Represented By: Martha Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Dedra Seibel Curteman
Represented By: Bradford Collins Patrick
Represented By: Martha Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: One Hundred Miles
Represented By: William W. Sapp
Represented By: Megan Hinkle Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altamaha Riverkeeper
Represented By: William W. Sapp
Represented By: Megan Hinkle Huynh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for a Sustainable Coast, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Sea Island Acquisition, LLC
Represented By: James B. Durham
Represented By: Patricia Thrower Barmeyer
Represented By: Randy J. Butterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?