Baker & Murakami Produce Company LLLP et al v. Weng Farms Inc. et al
Plaintiff: J.F. Palmer and Sons Produce, Inc. and Baker & Murakami Produce Company LLLP
Defendant: Liya Weng, Hillcrest Farm, Weng Farms Inc. and William R. Foster
Case Number: 4:2018cv00252
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: James E Graham
Referring Judge: William T Moore
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Baker & Murakami Produce Company LLLP, J.F. Palmer and Sons Produce, Inc.. Weng Farms Inc. served on 12/8/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (De Falco, Steven)
December 26, 2018 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Baker & Murakami Produce Company LLLP, J.F. Palmer and Sons Produce, Inc.. Hillcrest Farm served on 12/15/2018, answer due 1/5/2019. (De Falco, Steven)
December 26, 2018 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Baker & Murakami Produce Company LLLP, J.F. Palmer and Sons Produce, Inc.. William R. Foster served on 12/15/2018, answer due 1/5/2019. (De Falco, Steven)
December 26, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Baker & Murakami Produce Company LLLP, J.F. Palmer and Sons Produce, Inc. re #17 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Transmittal-Delivery Confirmations, #2 Exhibit 2 - Email Notification)(De Falco, Steven) Modified on 12/27/2018 (trb).
December 7, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction set for 1/7/2019 03:00 PM in Savannah - 3rd Floor before Judge William T. Moore, Jr. (jgb)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting re #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Temporary Restraining Order ; granting re #16 Motion to Set Preliminary Injunction Hearing. Plaintiff's are DIRECTED to serve Defendants, or their counsel, with a copy of this Order by personal service by the close of business on December 14, 2018. Further, a hearing will be held on January 7, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. to discuss Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injuction. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 12/6/18. (loh)
December 5, 2018 Filing 16 *******Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION Set Preliminary Injunction Hearing and Allow Steven M. De Falco to Appear Telephonically for Hearing re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, by Baker & Murakami Produce Company LLLP, J.F. Palmer and Sons Produce, Inc. Responses due by 12/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Blue book Certifcation, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(De Falco, Steven)
December 5, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Baker & Murakami Produce Company LLLP, J.F. Palmer and Sons Produce, Inc. re #14 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Fed Ex Label to Liya Weng-Weng Farms/Weng Farms (Brooklyn), #2 Exhibit 2 - Fed Ex Label to Foster/ Weng Farms/ Hillcrest (Ohio), #3 Exhibit 3 - E-mail to Foster/Weng Farms/Hillcrest/Liya)(De Falco, Steven)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting re #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Extend Temporary Restraining Order re 7 Order. Plaintiff's are DIRECTED to serve Defendants, or their counsel, with a copy of this Order by personal service by the close of business on November 28, 2018. The Court will schedule a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by separate order. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 11/21/18. (loh)
November 19, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Temporary Restraining Order re 7 Order, by Baker & Murakami Produce Company LLLP, J.F. Palmer and Sons Produce, Inc. Responses due by 12/3/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(De Falco, Steven)
November 14, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #1 Complaint, Docket Entries #1 , 4 , #5 , and 7 by Baker & Murakami Produce Company LLLP, J.F. Palmer and Sons Produce, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Fed Ex Label to Liya Weng-Weng Farms/Weng Farms (NY Address #1), #2 Exhibit 2 - Fed Ex Label to Liya Weng/Weng Farms (NY Address #2), #3 Exhibit 3 - Fed Ex Label William Foster/Weng Farms/Hillcrest Farms (Ohio), #4 Exhibit 4 - E-mails to Weng Farms/William Foster/Liya Weng, #5 Exhibit 5 - E-mail to Weng Farms' attorney in different matter)(De Falco, Steven)
November 14, 2018 Filing 11 Litigants' Bill of Rights by J.F. Palmer and Sons Produce, Inc.. (De Falco, Steven)
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Baker & Murakami Produce Company LLLP. (De Falco, Steven)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 11/14/18. (sff) Modified on 11/15/2018 (sff).
November 14, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2482927, Fee Amount $200, by Baker & Murakami Produce Company LLLP, J.F. Palmer and Sons Produce, Inc.. Responses due by 11/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(De Falco, Steven)
November 14, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Receipt Number 113J-2482927, Fee Amount $200. (loh)
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Baker & Murakami Produce Company LLLP, J.F. Palmer and Sons Produce, Inc. (Paul, Patricia)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Baker & Murakami Produce Company LLLP, J.F. Palmer and Sons Produce, Inc.. Responses due by 11/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Briefs Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A -- Cases, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Jerry Baker, #4 Exhibit A to Baker Decl, #5 Exhibit B to Baker Decl, #6 Exhibit C to Baker Decl, #7 Exhibit D to Baker Decl, #8 Exhibit E to Baker Decl, #9 Exhibit F to Baker Decl, #10 Exhibit G to Baker Decl, #11 Exhibit Declaration of Gary Palmer, #12 Exhibit A to Palmer Decl)(Paul, Patricia)
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER: Report of 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 11/01/2018. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (evs)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (evs)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Baker & Murakami Produce Company LLLP, J.F. Palmer and Sons Produce, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - SOS Docs, #3 Exhibit B - Baker's Invoices, #4 Exhibit C - Palmer's Invoices)(evs)
November 1, 2018 Filing fee: $400, receipt number 113J-2475419. (evs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker & Murakami Produce Company LLLP et al v. Weng Farms Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liya Weng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillcrest Farm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weng Farms Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.F. Palmer and Sons Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia T. Paul
Represented By: Steven M. De Falco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baker & Murakami Produce Company LLLP
Represented By: Patricia T. Paul
Represented By: Steven M. De Falco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?