Center for Sustainable Coast, Inc. v. The United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Plaintiff: Center for Sustainable Coast, Inc. and Center for a Sustainable Coast, Inc.
Defendant: Lt. General Todd T. Semonite, The United States Army Corps of Engineers, Tunis McElwain and Col. Daniel Hibner
Case Number: 4:2018cv00254
Filed: November 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: James E Graham
2 Judge: J Randal Hall
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay by Daniel Hibner, Tunis McElwain, Todd T. Semonite, The United States Army Corps of Engineers. Responses due by 1/14/2019. (Curteman, Dedra)
December 14, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants (Curteman, Dedra)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Consent Motion to Consolidate this case with CV 418-251. The Clerk is instructed to consolidate this case with case number 418-251 and join "Center for a Sustainable Coast, Inc." as a plaintiff in the consolidate case, CV 418-251. The Court further directs the parties to prepare and submit a Rule 26(f) report that will govern the consolidated action by 5:00 P.M. on Monday, January 14, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 12/13/2018. (thb) Modified on 12/14/2018 (thb).
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge J. Randal Hall for all further proceedings. District Judge R. Stan Baker no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 12/12/2018. (thb)
December 3, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha Mann on behalf of Daniel Hibner, Tunis McElwain, Todd T. Semonite, The United States Army Corps of Engineers (Mann, Martha)
December 3, 2018 Filing 10 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases 4:18-CV-00254 and 4:18-CV-00251 by Center for a Sustainable Coast, Inc.. Responses due by 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Briefs)(Sturm, Kimberly)
November 26, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center for a Sustainable Coast, Inc. Daniel Hibner served on 11/13/2018, answer due 1/12/2018. (Sturm, Kimberly) Modified on 11/26/2018 (wwp).
November 26, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Daniel Hibner answer due 1/12/2018. (wwp)
November 21, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Tunis McElwain answer due 1/4/2019; Todd T. Semonite answer due 1/4/2019; The United States Army Corps of Engineers answer due 1/4/2019. (wwp)
November 16, 2018 Filing 8 Document filed with incorrect docket type. Attorney notified to refile. (Sturm, Kimberly) Modified on 11/20/2018 (wwp).
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Disclosure Statement, Notice of ADR and Case Managment Proceedures and Rule 26 Instructions served on Operations Division - Regulatory Branch at US Army Corps of Engineers on 11/05/18, filed by Center for a Sustainable Coast, Inc. (Sturm, Kimberly) Modified on 11/20/2018 (wwp).
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Disclosure Statement, Notice of ADR and Case Managment Proceedures and Rule 26 Instructions served on Todd Semonite on 11/05/18, filed by Center for a Sustainable Coast, Inc. (Sturm, Kimberly) Modified on 11/20/2018 (wwp).
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Disclosure Statement, Notice of ADR and Case Managment Proceedures and Rule 26 Instructions served on Tunis McElwain on 11/05/18, filed by Center for a Sustainable Coast, Inc. (Sturm, Kimberly) Modified on 11/20/2018 (wwp).
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Center for a Sustainable Coast, Inc. (Sturm, Kimberly)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 11/2/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (loh)
November 2, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (loh)
November 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Center for a Sustainable Coast, Inc. Receipt # 113J-2476427 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Sustainable Coast, Inc. v. The United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. General Todd T. Semonite
Represented By: Dedra Seibel Curteman
Represented By: Martha Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Dedra Seibel Curteman
Represented By: Martha Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tunis McElwain
Represented By: Dedra Seibel Curteman
Represented By: Martha Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Col. Daniel Hibner
Represented By: Dedra Seibel Curteman
Represented By: Martha Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Sustainable Coast, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for a Sustainable Coast, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Ann Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?