Klubek et al v. Smith & Nephew, Inc
Plaintiff: Ronald Klubek and Joanne Klubek
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc
Case Number: 4:2018cv00261
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: James E Graham
Referring Judge: William T Moore
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 12/12/18. (sff)
December 12, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2499714, Fee Amount $200, by Smith & Nephew, Inc. Responses due by 12/26/2018. (Koelz, Andrew)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 12/12/18. (sff)
December 12, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2499672, Fee Amount $200, by Smith & Nephew, Inc. Responses due by 12/26/2018. (Calvert, Matthew)
November 29, 2018 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Smith & Nephew, Inc identifying Smith & Nephew plc as Corporate Parent.. (Millman, Daniel)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Smith & Nephew, Inc.(Millman, Daniel)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Joanne Klubek, Ronald Klubek. (Hart, Ronald)
November 10, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ronald Klubek, Joanne Klubek. Smith & Nephew, Inc served on 11/8/2018, answer due 11/29/2018. (Hart, Ronald)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Smith & Nephew, Inc. (wwp)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 11/7/18. (wwp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2018: #1 Notice) (wwp).
November 7, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2478767. (wwp)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Smith & Nephew, Inc filed by Ronald Klubek, Joanne Klubek. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klubek et al v. Smith & Nephew, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Klubek
Represented By: Ronald Paul Hart, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Klubek
Represented By: Ronald Paul Hart, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc
Represented By: Andrew S. Koelz
Represented By: Matthew Calvert
Represented By: Daniel B. Millman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?