Payne et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Robert A. Payne and Gloria J. Payne
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2018cv00265
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: James E Graham
Referring Judge: William T Moore
2 Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray. Magistrate Judge James E. Graham no longer assigned to the case. (loh)
January 7, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Stay (due to lapse in appropriations) filed by Gloria J. Payne, Robert A. Payne. (Sturtevant, Glen)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Stay (due to lapse in appropriations) by United States of America. Responses due by 1/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Statkus, Shannon)
December 7, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Gloria J. Payne answer due 1/19/2019. (trb)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gloria J. Payne. (Ray, Dale)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert A. Payne. United States of America served on 11/19/2018, answer due 1/19/2019. (Ray, Dale) Modified on 12/12/2018 (trb).
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICEPRO HAC VICE; granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICEPRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 12/06/18. (sff)
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2494675, Fee Amount $200, by Robert A. Payne. Responses due by 12/19/2018. (Ray, Dale)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2494670, Fee Amount $200, by Gloria J. Payne. Responses due by 12/19/2018. (Ray, Dale)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States of America: U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (evs)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER: Report of 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 11/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (evs)
November 12, 2018 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2481334. (evs)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America, filed by Robert A. Payne, Gloria J. Payne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Claim for Damage, Injury, or Death, #3 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Notice of Claim, #4 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Screening Certificate of Merit)(evs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Payne et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Payne
Represented By: Dale C. Ray, Jr.
Represented By: Brewster S. Rawls
Represented By: Glen H. Sturtevant, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria J. Payne
Represented By: Dale C. Ray, Jr.
Represented By: Brewster S. Rawls
Represented By: Glen H. Sturtevant, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Shannon Heath Statkus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?