Mai v. Nine Line Apparel, Inc.
Plaintiff: Brandy Mai
Defendant: Nine Line Apparel, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00277
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: James E Graham
Referring Judge: William T Moore
2 Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12117
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray. Magistrate Judge James E. Graham no longer assigned to the case. (loh)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 01/02/19. (sff)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Nine Line Apparel, Inc.. (Dorsey, Samantha)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Nine Line Apparel, Inc..(Dorsey, Samantha)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2507018, Fee Amount $200, by Nine Line Apparel, Inc.. Responses due by 1/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Cases)(Dorsey, Samantha) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/27/2018: #2 Motion, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order) (trb).
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Brandy Mai. (Miller, Adian)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER: Report of 26(f) Planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 11/27/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of litigants' Bill of Rights) (jrb)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Nine Line Apparel, Inc. (pts)
November 27, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 113J-2489701. (pts)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nine Line Apparel, Inc., filed by Brandy Mai. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mai v. Nine Line Apparel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nine Line Apparel, Inc.
Represented By: Samantha M. Dorsey
Represented By: Robert A. Luskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Mai
Represented By: Adian R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?