Kumar et al v. Nautilus Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Devendra Kumar and Charulatta Patel
Defendant: Nautilus Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv00279
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: Georgia Southern District Court
Office: Savannah Office
0 Judge: R Stan Baker
1 Judge: James E Graham
2 Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray. Magistrate Judge James E. Graham no longer assigned to the case. (loh)
December 26, 2018 15 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Nautilus Insurance Company.(Savrin, Philip)
December 19, 2018 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nautilus Insurance Company, filed by Devendra Kumar, Charulatta Patel.(Compton, William)
December 14, 2018 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Devendra Kumar, Charulatta Patel.(Compton, William)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 12 TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave of Absence. The attorney must make arrangements for other counsel to appear in the event the case is scheduled for hearing or trial during such leave. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 12/12/18. (sff)
December 12, 2018 11 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to Devendra Kumar, Charulatta Patel for dates of : January 24, 2019 - January 28, 2019; and March 25, 2019 - March 29, 2019 by Devendra Kumar, Charulatta Patel. Responses due by 12/26/2018. REFERRED to Judge James E. Graham.(ca)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 12/12/18. (sff)
December 10, 2018 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for J. Remington Huggins. Fee Amount $200, by Devendra Kumar, Charulatta Patel. REFERRED to Judge James E. Graham.(wwp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/11/2018: #1 Corrected Proposed Order) (pts).
December 7, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 12/14/2018. (loh)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 ORDER granting re #7 Motion to Amend Complaint and Set Response Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 12/7/18. (loh)
December 7, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 Consent MOTION to Amend Complaint and Set Response Deadlines. (loh)
December 7, 2018 7 Consent MOTION to Amend Complaint and Set Response Deadlines by Devendra Kumar, Charulatta Patel. Responses due by 12/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Compton, William)
December 6, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Service of Responsive Pleadings due 12/21/2018. Amended Complaint due by 12/7/2018. Service of Objections and Responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Defendant due by 1/21/2019. (evs)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint and Set Response Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 12/06/2018. (evs)
December 6, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William M. Compton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Compton, William)
December 3, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint and Set Response Deadlines. (evs)
November 30, 2018 4 *******Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint and Set Response Deadlines by Nautilus Insurance Company. Responses due by 12/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Savrin, Philip)
November 29, 2018 3 NOTICE to all counsel of record re #1 Notice of Removal. Set/Reset Deadlines: Nautilus Insurance Company answer due 12/6/2018. Plaintiff's Attorney Notice of Appearance due by 12/9/2018. State Motions due by 12/13/2018. (wwp)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 2 Rule 26 Instruction ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 11/28/18. (wwp)
November 28, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nautilus Insurance Company from State Court of Chatham County, case number SPCV18-01033-WA. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113j-2490936), filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Notice, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp) Modified on 11/30/2018 (evs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kumar et al v. Nautilus Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nautilus Insurance Company
Represented By: Philip W. Savrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devendra Kumar
Represented By: J. Remington Huggins
Represented By: William M. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charulatta Patel
Represented By: J. Remington Huggins
Represented By: William M. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?