Copeland et al v. Spanish Moss Pool I, LLC
Plaintiff: Gary Copeland and Jeannette P Waters
Defendant: Spanish Moss Pool I, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00287
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: James E Graham
Referring Judge: William T Moore
2 Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss re #6 is DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 01/10/2019. (evk) Modified on 1/11/2019 (evk).
January 8, 2019 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray. Magistrate Judge James E. Graham no longer assigned to the case. (loh)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gary Copeland re #7 Stipulation of Dismissal (Braun, Richard)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal by all parties by Gary Copeland. (Braun, Richard)
December 13, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint by Spanish Moss Pool I, LLC. Responses due by 12/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Briefs Memo to MTD, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Tate, William)
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 Verified ANSWER to Complaint by Spanish Moss Pool I, LLC.(Tate, William)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #1 Notice of Removal. (trb)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 12/7/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (trb)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Parties by Spanish Moss Pool I, LLC. (trb)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Spanish Moss Pool I, LLC from Superior Court of Chatham County, case number SUV2018000926. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J-2495651), filed by Spanish Moss Pool I, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Service of Process Transmittal , #3 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Motion For Temporary Restraining Order)(trb) Modified on 12/10/2018 (trb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Copeland et al v. Spanish Moss Pool I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Copeland
Represented By: Richard E. Braun, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeannette P Waters
Represented By: Richard E. Braun, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spanish Moss Pool I, LLC
Represented By: William Oxford Tate
Represented By: Lisa Frank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?