Moon v. Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Neal B. Moon
Defendant: Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2018cv00308
Filed: December 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: James E Graham
2 Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:4072
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (J. Lewis, E.)
February 15, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company.(J. Lewis, E.)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company answer due by 2/15/2019. #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company is DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 01/18/2019. (evk) Modified on 1/23/2019 (evk).
January 18, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint , #8 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. (wwp)
January 17, 2019 Filing 8 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. Responses due by 1/31/2019. (J. Lewis, E.)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency as to Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company re #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint . Set Deadlines: Compliance due by 1/31/2019. (evk)
January 16, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. Responses due by 1/30/2019. (Johnson, E.)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint with Exhibits, Summons, Civil Coversheet and Rule 26 Instruction Order served on Denise Combs on January 2, 2019, filed by Neal B. Moon. (Bolger, Catherine)
January 8, 2019 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray. Magistrate Judge James E. Graham no longer assigned to the case. (loh)
December 26, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (evs)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Submitted (Bolger, Catherine)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Rule 26 Instruction Order. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 12/20/2018. (evs)
December 19, 2018 Filing fee paid: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2505034. (evs)
December 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Neal B. Moon against Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Flood Insurance Policy Packet, #2 Exhibit October 23, 2018 Correspondence, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(evs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moon v. Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: E. Righton J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neal B. Moon
Represented By: Catherine M. Bolger
Represented By: Mathew M. McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?