BASF Corp. v. Hychem, Inc.

Plaintiff: BASF Corp.
Defendant: Hychem, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018mc00013
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
0 Judge: R Stan Baker
1 Judge: James E Graham
2 Judge: William T Moore
3 Judge: G R Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 26, 2018 Filing 22 Certificate of Related Cases 3.1 . (Riddle, Robert)
October 19, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Lucas Drayton Bradley on behalf of BASF Corp. (Bradley, Lucas)
October 19, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Michael Baiad on behalf of BASF Corp. (Baiad, Todd)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE; granting #18 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 10/17/18. (sff)
October 16, 2018 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Aviva Wernick, Receipt Number 113J-2465321, Fee Amount $200, #18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James W. Dabney, Receipt Number 113J-2465334, Fee Amount $200. (loh)
October 16, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James W. Dabney. Receipt Number 113J-2465334, Fee Amount $200, by Hychem, Inc. Responses due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Disclosure Pursuant to Local Rule 83.4, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice for James W. Dabney)(Durham, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2018: #4 Corrected Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (loh).
October 16, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Aviva Wernick. Receipt Number 113J-2465321, Fee Amount $200, by Hychem, Inc. Responses due by 10/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice for Aviva Wernick)(Durham, James) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/18/2018: #3 Corrected Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice) (loh).
October 9, 2018 Filing 16 Amendment to #15 Notice of Appearance of James D. Durham by Hychem, Inc. (Durham, James)
October 9, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Durham on behalf of Hychem, Inc. (Durham, James)
October 9, 2018 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Graham per order in case 4:18mc-16. Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (jrb)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE; granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 10/09/18. (sff)
October 8, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2460659, Fee Amount $200, by BASF Corp.. Responses due by 10/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 List of All Cases Filed In This Court, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Baiad, Todd)
October 8, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2460658, Fee Amount $200, by BASF Corp.. Responses due by 10/22/2018. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 List of All Cases Filed in this Court, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Baiad, Todd)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge R. Stan Baker for all further proceedings. Judge William T. Moore, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 9/26/18. (loh)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE to all counsel of record that a #1 Motion/complaint was transferred to the Southern District of Georgia. (wwp)
September 24, 2018 Filing 9 Case transfer in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 0:18-mc-62103. Case transferred electronically
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Transferring and Closing Case. ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Plaintiffs Motion to Compel ECF No. #1 shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, for resolution, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(f). The Clerk of Court for the Southern District of Florida is directed to promptly effectuate this transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 9/21/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by BASF, Corp. (Herrera, Sujey)
September 19, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Hychem's Opposition to BASF Corp.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Hychem, Inc. by Hychem, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Richard M. Koehl, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N)(Wernick, Aviva)
September 19, 2018 Filing 5 RESPONSE to #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, by Hychem, Inc.. (Wernick, Aviva)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATUS REPORT ORDER. Status Report due by 9/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow on 9/17/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Referring Motion To Magistrate Judge; Referring #1 Motion to Compel Production of Documents to Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow to be heard and determined consistent with 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72, and Rule 1(c) of the Local Magistrate Judge Rules. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 9/14/2018. See attached document for full details. (jas)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (jas)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena to Enforce from Another District BASF Corp.'s Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Hychem, Inc. and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Filing fee $47.00 receipt number 113C-10970580, filed by BASF Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)(Herrera, Sujey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BASF Corp. v. Hychem, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hychem, Inc.
Represented By: Aviva L. Wernick
Represented By: James Wilson Dabney
Represented By: James D. Durham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BASF Corp.
Represented By: Lisa M. Thomas
Represented By: Robert R. Riddle
Represented By: Sujey Scarlett Herrera
Represented By: Lucas Drayton Bradley
Represented By: Todd Michael Baiad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?