LM Insurance Corporation v. J.C.B. Roofing-II, Inc.

Plaintiff: LM Insurance Corporation
Defendant: J.C.B. Roofing-II, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00067
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to LM Insurance Corporation for dates of : 09/23/2019 - 01/02/2020. (loh)
July 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to LM Insurance Corporation for dates of : 09/23/2019 - 01/02/2020 by LM Insurance Corporation. Responses due by 7/25/2019. (Lane, Megan)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Restriction/Return of Discovery Related Materials as to LM Insurance Corporation - re 10 Notice (Other). (cmr)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Crosby, Scott)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 05/29/19. (sff)
May 29, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2612747, Fee Amount $200. (trb)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2612747, Fee Amount $200, by LM Insurance Corporation. Responses due by 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Crosby, Scott)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by J.C.B. Roofing-II, Inc..(Hart, R.)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (jrb)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 3/29/19. (jrb)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to J.C.B. Roofing-II, Inc. (jrb)
March 28, 2019 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2570736. (jrb)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by LM Insurance Corporation. (jrb)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against J.C.B. Roofing-II, Inc., filed by LM Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jrb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LM Insurance Corporation v. J.C.B. Roofing-II, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.C.B. Roofing-II, Inc.
Represented By: R. Jonathan Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LM Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Megan H. Lane
Represented By: Scott J. Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?