Randall v. The City of Savannah, GA et al

Plaintiff: Ryan Kenneth Randall
Defendant: Chatham County Police, Chatham County City Council and The City of Savannah, GA
Case Number: 4:2019cv00084
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered dismissing this case without prejudice. (loh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2019: #1 Corrected Judgment) (loh).
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER dismissing as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; adopting re #6 Report and Recommendations Dismissing this case Without Prejudice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close this case. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 6/24/19. (loh)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the U.S. Magistrate Judge recommending the dismissal of re #1 Complaint filed by Ryan Kenneth Randall without prejudice for failing to comply with the Court's Order. Objections to R&R due by 6/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 5/28/19. (jrb)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (jrb)
April 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 5/18/2019. (jrb)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Plaintiff to submit a supplement to his motion providing all required information within 30 days from the date of this order re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ryan Kenneth Randall. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/18/19. (jrb)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/17/19. (jrb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2019: #1 Notice of Litigants' Bill of Rights) (jrb).
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ryan Kenneth Randall. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(jrb)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ryan Kenneth Randall.(jrb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Randall v. The City of Savannah, GA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chatham County Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chatham County City Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Savannah, GA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Kenneth Randall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?