Trustgard Insurance Company v. Daniels
Plaintiff: Trustgard Insurance Company
Defendant: Alston Daniels
Case Number: 4:2019cv00130
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Alston Daniels. (wwp)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Entry of Default by Trustgard Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit 2 - Court docket text setting deadline for Answer)(Sprinkle, Brian)
July 31, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment. (wwp)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment by Trustgard Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Assignment of Security Deed, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Amended Complaint)(Sprinkle, Brian)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Trustgard Insurance Company. (Sprinkle, Brian)
June 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Alston Daniels answer due 7/9/2019. (wwp)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint with Exhibits served on Alston Daniels on June 18, 2019, filed by Trustgard Insurance Company. (Sprinkle, Brian)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Trustgard Insurance Company Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance (Sprinkle, Brian)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (jrb)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 6/14/19. (loh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alston Daniels. (loh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alston Daniels, filed by Trustgard Insurance Company. Receipt # 113J-2623063. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustgard Insurance Company v. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustgard Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael J. Goldman
Represented By: Brian W. Sprinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alston Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?