Progressive Mountain Insurance Company v. Numbers Enterprise, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Progressive Mountain Insurance Company
Defendant: James Moore, B&N Trucking, Inc, Stanley J. Smart, Southern LNG Company, LLC, Scott & Sons Trucking, LLC, Southern Liquefaction CO., LLC, IHI E&C International Company, Elba Liquefaction Company, LLC, Kinder Morgan, Inc, Praetorian Insurance Company, Numbers Enterprise, LLC, Patrick Styblo and Tru Blu Trucking, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00166
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to James Moore, Numbers Enterprise, LLC, Scott & Sons Trucking, LLC, Stanley J. Smart. (loh)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Submitted (Bass, Thomas)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Submitted (Bass, Thomas)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Submitted (Bass, Thomas)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Submitted (Bass, Thomas)
July 29, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Permit Jurisdictional Discovery. (evk)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Permit Jurisdictional Discovery , by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company. Responses due by 8/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A)(Bass, Thomas)
July 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 7/25/2019. (pts)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to file an amended complaint within fourteen days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 7/11/2019. (pts)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 General ORDER pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 7/11/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (wwp)
July 10, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2638270. (wwp)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Progressive Mountain Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive Mountain Insurance Company v. Numbers Enterprise, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&N Trucking, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley J. Smart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern LNG Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott & Sons Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Liquefaction CO., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IHI E&C International Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elba Liquefaction Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinder Morgan, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Praetorian Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Numbers Enterprise, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Styblo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tru Blu Trucking, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Mountain Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Langston Bass, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?