Cocke et al v. Continental Motors, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: John Hartwell Cocke, John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke and William Marston Becker
Defendant: Kristen Hunter, Aviation Development Group, LLC, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Thomas Huff and Continential Motors, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00169
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 20 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Continential Motors, Inc.. (Andersen, Donald)
September 4, 2019 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Continental Motors, Inc. (jlh)
September 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA answer due 10/8/2019. (jlh)
September 4, 2019 ***Entered in Error*** (jlh) Modified on 9/4/2019 (jlh).
September 3, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on US AG William Barr on 08/13/2019, filed by William Marston Becker(as Conservator of P.S.G.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of C.E.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of W.R.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of E.C.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of J.S.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke(as Executor of the Estate of Catherine Crichton Cocke, Deceased), John Hartwell Cocke(as Executor of the Estate of William Byron Cocke, Deceased), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of C.E.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of E.C.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of P.S.G.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of W.R.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of J.S.C., a Minor). (Barks, Daniel) Modified on 9/4/2019 (jlh).
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Continental Motors, Inc. on 08/12/2019, filed by William Marston Becker(as Conservator of P.S.G.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of C.E.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of W.R.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of E.C.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of J.S.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke(as Executor of the Estate of Catherine Crichton Cocke, Deceased), John Hartwell Cocke(as Executor of the Estate of William Byron Cocke, Deceased), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of C.E.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of E.C.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of P.S.G.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of W.R.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of J.S.C., a Minor). (Barks, Daniel) Modified on 9/4/2019 (jlh).
September 3, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Submitted (Barks, Daniel)
August 30, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Continential Motors, Inc. Responses due by 9/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael Ward, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Terry Horton)(Andersen, Donald) Modified on 9/3/2019 (jlh).
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of C.E.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of P.S.G.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke(as Executor of the Estate of Catherine Crichton Cocke, Deceased), John Hartwell Cocke(as Executor of the Estate of William Byron Cocke, Deceased), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of C.E.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of W.R.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of E.C.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of P.S.G.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of W.R.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of E.C.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of J.S.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of J.S.C., a Minor). Kristen Hunter waiver sent on 8/16/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Barks, Daniel)
August 13, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of C.E.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of P.S.G.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke(as Executor of the Estate of Catherine Crichton Cocke, Deceased), John Hartwell Cocke(as Executor of the Estate of William Byron Cocke, Deceased), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of C.E.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of W.R.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of E.C.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of P.S.G.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of W.R.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of E.C.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of J.S.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of J.S.C., a Minor). Thomas Huff waiver sent on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Barks, Daniel)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of C.E.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of P.S.G.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke(as Executor of the Estate of Catherine Crichton Cocke, Deceased), John Hartwell Cocke(as Executor of the Estate of William Byron Cocke, Deceased), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of C.E.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of W.R.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of E.C.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of P.S.G.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of W.R.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of E.C.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of J.S.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of J.S.C., a Minor). Aviation Development Group, LLC waiver sent on 8/8/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Barks, Daniel)
August 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA answer due 10/8/2019. (evk)
August 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Continential Motors, Inc. answer due 8/30/2019. (evk) Modified on 8/13/2019 (evk).
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Continental Motors, Inc. on 08/09/2019, filed by William Marston Becker(as Conservator of P.S.G.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of C.E.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of W.R.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of E.C.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of J.S.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke(as Executor of the Estate of Catherine Crichton Cocke, Deceased), John Hartwell Cocke(as Executor of the Estate of William Byron Cocke, Deceased), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of C.E.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of E.C.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of P.S.G.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of W.R.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of J.S.C., a Minor). (Barks, Daniel) Modified on 8/13/2019 (evk).
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Jonathan A. Porter, Asst. US Attorney on 08/09/2019, filed by William Marston Becker(as Conservator of P.S.G.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of C.E.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of W.R.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of E.C.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of J.S.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke(as Executor of the Estate of Catherine Crichton Cocke, Deceased), John Hartwell Cocke(as Executor of the Estate of William Byron Cocke, Deceased), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of C.E.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of E.C.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of P.S.G.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of W.R.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of J.S.C., a Minor). (Barks, Daniel) Modified on 8/13/2019 (evk).
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 07/30/19. (sff)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 07/30/19. (sff)
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Douglas Latto Receipt Number 113J-2653539, Fee Amount $200, by William Marston Becker(as Conservator of P.S.G.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of C.E.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of W.R.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of E.C.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of J.S.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke(as Executor of the Estate of Catherine Crichton Cocke, Deceased), John Hartwell Cocke(as Executor of the Estate of William Byron Cocke, Deceased), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of C.E.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of E.C.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of P.S.G.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of W.R.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of J.S.C., a Minor). Responses due by 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Barks, Daniel)
July 30, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeanne O'Grady Receipt Number 113J-2653514, Fee Amount $200. (evk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeanne O'Grady Receipt Number 113J-2653514, Fee Amount $200, by William Marston Becker(as Conservator of P.S.G.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of C.E.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of W.R.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of E.C.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of J.S.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke(as Executor of the Estate of Catherine Crichton Cocke, Deceased), John Hartwell Cocke(as Executor of the Estate of William Byron Cocke, Deceased), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of C.E.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of E.C.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of P.S.G.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of W.R.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of J.S.C., a Minor). Responses due by 8/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Barks, Daniel)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by William Marston Becker, William Marston Becker, William Marston Becker, William Marston Becker, William Marston Becker, John Hartwell Cocke, John Hartwell Cocke, John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke, John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke, John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke, John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke, John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke. (Barks, Daniel)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 7/12/19. (Attachments: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (jrb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (jrb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to all Defendants U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (pts) Modified on 7/15/2019 (jlh).
July 12, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number AUG026465. (pts)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of C.E.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of P.S.G.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke(as Executor of the Estate of Catherine Crichton Cocke, Deceased), John Hartwell Cocke(as Executor of the Estate of William Byron Cocke, Deceased), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of C.E.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of W.R.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of E.C.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of W.R.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of E.C.C., a Minor), John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke(as Guardians of J.S.C., a Minor), William Marston Becker(as Conservator of J.S.C., a Minor). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint for Damages, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint for Damages, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(pts)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cocke et al v. Continental Motors, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aviation Development Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continential Motors, Inc.
Represented By: Donald Ross Andersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hartwell Cocke
Represented By: Daniel Douglass Barks
Represented By: Jeanne M. O'Grady
Represented By: Douglas A. Latto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hartwell Cocke and Virginia Frances Cocke
Represented By: Daniel Douglass Barks
Represented By: Jeanne M. O'Grady
Represented By: Douglas A. Latto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Marston Becker
Represented By: Daniel Douglass Barks
Represented By: Jeanne M. O'Grady
Represented By: Douglas A. Latto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?