Richey v. Chatham County Detention Center
Plaintiff: Rashard Akeem Richey
Defendant: Chatham County Detention Center
Case Number: 4:2019cv00170
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2019 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number SAV036165, SAV036265. (loh)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 8/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/9/19. (wwp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/9/2019: #1 Order Main Doc) (wwp).
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rashard Akeem Richey. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray.(evk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing fee deficiency re #1 Complaint. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 8/5/2019. (wwp)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chatham County Detention Center, filed by Rashard Akeem Richey.(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richey v. Chatham County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chatham County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rashard Akeem Richey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?