Rivera-Lopez v. Lockheed Martin Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Emil Rivera-Lopez
Defendant: Sikorsky Support Services, Inc., The Boeing Company, Sikorsky Aircraft Services, Lockheed Martin Corporation, General Electric Company, Hamilton Sunstrand Corporation, Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation and Boeing Sikorsky Aircraft Support, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00211
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Boeing Sikorsky Aircraft Support, LLC, General Electric Company, Hamilton Sunstrand Corporation, Lockheed Martin Corporation, Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation, Sikorsky Support Services, Inc., The Boeing Company. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons, #5 summons, #6 summons)(wwp)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing by Emil Rivera-Lopez Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons Boeing Sikorsky, #2 Summons General Electric, #3 Summons Hamilton Sundstrand, #4 Summons Lockheed Martin, #5 Summons Sikorsky Aircraft, #6 Summons Sikorsky Support Services, #7 Summons The Boeing Company)(Dean, Kevin)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Emil Rivera-Lopez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dean, Kevin)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Plaintiffs to file an amended complaint within 14 days from the date of this order re #1 Complaint filed by Emil Rivera-Lopez. (Compliance due by 9/10/2019). Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 8/27/19. (wwp) Modified on 8/27/2019 (wwp).
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/26/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Notice) (wwp)
August 24, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 113J-2671601. (wwp)
August 23, 2019 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Emil Rivera-Lopez. (wwp)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Emil Rivera-Lopez.(wwp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (wwp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera-Lopez v. Lockheed Martin Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sikorsky Support Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Boeing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sikorsky Aircraft Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hamilton Sunstrand Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sikorsky Aircraft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Sikorsky Aircraft Support, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emil Rivera-Lopez
Represented By: Kevin R. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?