Carter v. Standard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kelley Carter
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00232
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting re #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Standard Insurance Company answer due 11/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/21/19. (loh)
October 21, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. (loh)
October 21, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Standard Insurance Company. Responses due by 11/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Consent Order))(Pohlmann, Aaron)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting re #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Standard Insurance Company answer due 10/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 9/17/19. (loh)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L. Rouse on behalf of Kelley Carter (Rouse, Christopher)
September 16, 2019 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. (loh)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Standard Insurance Company. Responses due by 9/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order (Consent Order))(Pohlmann, Aaron)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp)
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/13/19. (wwp)
September 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Standard Insurance Company answer due 9/20/2019. (wwp)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to all counsel of record re #1 Notice of Removal. Set/Reset Deadlines: Appearance Compliance due by 9/22/2019. State Motions due by 9/27/2019. (wwp)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Standard Insurance Company. (wwp)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Standard Insurance Company from State Court of Chatham County, case number STCV19-01258. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J-2683210), filed by Standard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A General Civil and Domestic Relations Filing Information Form, #2 Exhibit B State Complaint, #3 Exhibit C State Summons, #4 Exhibit D - USCR 5.2 Certificate, #5 Exhibit E - USCR 5.2 Certificate, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelley Carter
Represented By: Christopher L. Rouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Bondurant
Represented By: Aaron E. Pohlmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?