Goplus Corporation v. Crown Equipment Corporation
Plaintiff: Goplus Corporation
Defendant: Crown Equipment Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv00034
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply by Crown Equipment Corporation re #28 Response in Opposition to Motion. (Hayes, David)
April 10, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #26 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Goplus Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Strasberg, Steven)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER staying discovery pending the disposition of defendant's motion forjudgment on the pleadings re #25 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/1/20. (jrb)
March 27, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Crown Equipment Corporation. Responses due by 4/10/2020. (Hayes, David)
March 26, 2020 Filing 25 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Strasberg, Steven)
March 25, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Crown Equipment Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Hayes, David) Modified on 3/26/2020 (slt).
March 17, 2020 Filing 23 Notice to Withdraw by Crown Equipment Corporation re #7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support . (Hayes, David) Modified on 3/19/2020 (JH).
March 11, 2020 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Crown Equipment Corporation, filed by Goplus Corporation.(Kelleher, Christopher)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting re #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stephen A. Weigand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 3/10/2020. (loh)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting re #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pr Hac Vice for Jeffrey T. Cox. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 3/10/2020. (loh)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Steven Strasberg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 3/8/20. (jrb)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Anne-Marie Dao. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 3/8/20. (jrb)
March 5, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Hearing (Request for Oral Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings) by Crown Equipment Corporation. Re: #7 . Responses due by 3/19/2020. (Hayes, David) Modified on 3/6/2020 (jrb).
March 5, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Intent to File Reply in Support of Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings by Crown Equipment Corporation Re: #7 . (Hayes, David) Modified on 3/6/2020 (jrb).
March 5, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anne-Marie D. Dao Receipt Number 113J-2796578, Fee Amount $200,, #13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven L. Strasberg Receipt Number 113J-2796012, Fee Amount $200. (jrb)
March 5, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anne-Marie D. Dao Receipt Number 113J-2796578, Fee Amount $200, by Goplus Corporation. Responses due by 3/19/2020. (Kelleher, Christopher)
March 4, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support filed by Goplus Corporation. (Kelleher, Christopher)
March 4, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Steven L. Strasberg Receipt Number 113J-2796012, Fee Amount $200, by Goplus Corporation. Responses due by 3/18/2020. (Kelleher, Christopher)
March 4, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 3/18/2020. (jrb)
March 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (jrb)
February 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Kelleher on behalf of Goplus Corporation (Kelleher, Christopher)
February 24, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2789388, Fee Amount $200, by Crown Equipment Corporation. Responses due by 3/9/2020. (Hayes, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2020: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (jrb).
February 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2789243, Fee Amount $200, by Crown Equipment Corporation. Responses due by 3/9/2020. (Hayes, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/4/2020: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (jrb).
February 19, 2020 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Crown Equipment Corporation. (Hayes, David)
February 19, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support by Crown Equipment Corporation. Responses due by 3/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Hayes, David) Modified on 2/20/2020 (jrb).
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Crown Equipment Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Hayes, David) Modified on 2/20/2020 (jrb).
February 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing by Crown Equipment Corporation (Hayes, David)
February 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Appearance/Pro Hac Vice Motion due by 2/28/2020. Compliance due by 2/28/2020. (loh)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #1 Notice of Removal. (loh)
February 18, 2020 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (loh)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/18/2020. (loh)
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit A re #1 Notice of Removal by Crown Equipment Corporation. (Hayes, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/18/2020: #1 Corrected Exhibit A) (loh).
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crown Equipment Corporation from Superior Court of Chatham County, case number SPCV20-00051-FR. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J-2785354), filed by Goplus Corporation.(loh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/18/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (loh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goplus Corporation v. Crown Equipment Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goplus Corporation
Represented By: Steven Leonard Strasberg
Represented By: Anne-Marie D. Dao
Represented By: Christopher J. Kelleher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Equipment Corporation
Represented By: David V. Hayes
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Cox
Represented By: Stephen A. Weigand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?