Savannah Motorcars, LLC et al v. Volkswagen Group of America Inc
Plaintiff: Savannah Motorcars, LLC and Peacock RE LLC
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00037
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Brian K Epps
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James Andrew Bertron, Jr.; granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kadeisha A. West; and granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul T. Collins. Richard K. Hines has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Court's Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 3/25/2020. (cjc)
March 24, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kadeisha A. West Fee Amount $200,, #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice James A. Bertron, Jr. #12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Paul T. Collins. (wwp)
March 24, 2020 Filing 15 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Volkswagen Group of America Inc. (Hines, Richard)
March 24, 2020 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Volkswagen Group of America Inc. (Hines, Richard)
March 24, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Volkswagen Group of America Inc.(Hines, Richard)
March 24, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Paul T. Collins Receipt Number 113J-2808653, Fee Amount $200, by Volkswagen Group of America Inc. Responses due by 4/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Attorney Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Text of Proposed Order)(Hines, Richard)
March 24, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kadeisha A. West Receipt Number 113J-2808645, Fee Amount $200, by Volkswagen Group of America Inc. Responses due by 4/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Attorney Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Text of Proposed Order)(Hines, Richard)
March 24, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice James A. Bertron, Jr. Receipt Number 113J-2808629, Fee Amount $200, by Volkswagen Group of America Inc. Responses due by 4/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Attorney Certification, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit C - Text of Proposed Order)(Hines, Richard)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Craig Spickard and granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John W. Forehand. Timothy D. Roberts has entered an appearance in this case and vouches that he will satisfy the obligations of local counsel as required by this Court's Local Rule 83.4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 3/17/2020. (cjc)
March 13, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Craig Spickard Receipt Number 113J-2802706, Fee Amount $200,, #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John W. Forehand Receipt Number 113J-2802720, Fee Amount $200. (wwp)
March 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John W. Forehand Receipt Number 113J-2802720, Fee Amount $200, by Peacock RE LLC. Responses due by 3/27/2020. (Roberts, Timothy)
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Craig Spickard Receipt Number 113J-2802706, Fee Amount $200, by Savannah Motorcars, LLC. Responses due by 3/27/2020. (Roberts, Timothy)
March 11, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Volkswagen Group of America Inc answer due 3/24/2020. (wwp)
March 10, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Disclosure Statement, Litigants' Bill of Rights served on Alisha Smith on 03/03/2020, filed by Peacock RE LLC. (Roberts, Timothy)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Peacock RE LLC, Savannah Motorcars, LLC. (Roberts, Timothy)
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Savannah Motorcars, LLC. (Roberts, Timothy)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 2/20/20. (wwp)
February 20, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 113J-2787356. (wwp)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Volkswagen Group of America Inc. (wwp)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Volkswagen Group of America Inc, filed by Savannah Motorcars, LLC, Peacock RE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savannah Motorcars, LLC et al v. Volkswagen Group of America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savannah Motorcars, LLC
Represented By: Timothy D. Roberts
Represented By: John W. Forehand
Represented By: Robert Craig Spickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peacock RE LLC
Represented By: Timothy D. Roberts
Represented By: John W. Forehand
Represented By: Robert Craig Spickard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Volkswagen Group of America Inc
Represented By: James Andrew Bertron, Jr.
Represented By: Kadeisha A. West
Represented By: Richard K. Hines, V
Represented By: Paul T. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?