Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Metro Developers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Defendant: Metro Developers, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00041
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing discovery related material re #5 Notice (Other). (wwp) Modified on 4/13/2020 (wwp). Modified on 4/13/2020 (wwp). Modified on 4/13/2020 (wwp).
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 ***Discovery related removed from public view.***NOTICE by Cincinnati Insurance Company of Subpoena Duces Tecum for Production of Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum for Production of Documents)(Cantey, Morgan) Modified on 4/13/2020 (wwp).
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. Metro Developers, Inc. waiver sent on 3/12/2020, answer due 5/11/2020. (Cantey, Morgan)
March 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Metro Developers, Inc. (loh)
March 5, 2020 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (loh)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 3/5/2020. (loh)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metro Developers, Inc., filed by Cincinnati Insurance Company. Receipt # 113J-2796655 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cincinnati Insurance Company v. Metro Developers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Morgan Steele Cantey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Developers, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas John Laybourn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?