The Douglas Stewart Company, Inc. v. HIQO Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Douglas Stewart Company, Inc.
Defendant: HIQO Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00101
Filed: May 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #53 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Timothy J. Young as Counsel for Defendant. (wwp)
June 23, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Timothy J. Young as Counsel for Defendant by HIQO Solutions, Inc.. Responses due by 7/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Timothy J. Young as Counsel for Defendant)(Goins, Jonathan)
June 17, 2020 ***Staff notes - Emailed #52 Order to Timothy J. Young, tim.young_lewisbrisbois.com. Modified on 6/17/2020 (wwp). Modified on 6/17/2020 (wwp).
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/17/20. (wwp)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/31/2020. Discovery due by 11/18/2020. Motions due by 12/18/2020. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 8/31/2020. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 9/30/2020. Status Report due by 12/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/16/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Information) (wwp)
June 15, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Filing Discovery related materials re 49 Certificate of Service. (wwp)
June 15, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #48 Joint MOTION for Protective Order , #47 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (wwp)
June 15, 2020 Filing 48 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by HIQO Solutions, Inc.. Responses due by 6/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Goins, Jonathan)
June 15, 2020 Filing 47 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Goins, Jonathan)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting re #45 Motion for Leave of Absence for attorney Theresa Beaton for dates of July 20-27, 2020; August 26-September 1, 2020; September 7-8, 2020; September 23-28, 2020; November 23-30, 2020; and December 28, 2020-January 4, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/11/2020. (loh) Modified on 6/11/2020 (wwp).
June 9, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #45 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to The Douglas Stewart Company, Inc. for dates of : July 20-27, 2020; August 26-September 1, 2020; September 7-8, 2020; September 23-28, 2020; November 23-30, 2020; and December 28, 2020-January 4, 2021. (wwp)
June 9, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to The Douglas Stewart Company, Inc. for dates of : July 20-27, 2020; August 26-September 1, 2020; September 7-8, 2020; September 23-28, 2020; November 23-30, 2020; and December 28, 2020-January 4, 2021 by The Douglas Stewart Company, Inc.. Responses due by 6/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beaton, Theresa)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting re #42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/3/2020. (loh)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting re #41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/3/2020. (loh)
June 2, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2853602, Fee Amount $200. (wwp)
June 2, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2853512, Fee Amount $200. (wwp)
June 2, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2853602, Fee Amount $200, by The Douglas Stewart Company, Inc.. Responses due by 6/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Admission)(Beaton, Theresa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2020: #2 Declaration) (wwp).
June 1, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2853512, Fee Amount $200, by The Douglas Stewart Company, Inc.. Responses due by 6/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order of Admission)(Beaton, Theresa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2020: #2 Notice of cases) (wwp).
June 1, 2020 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint by HIQO Solutions, Inc..(Eason, Donavan)
May 26, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Roberts, IV on behalf of The Douglas Stewart Company, Inc. (Roberts, James)
May 26, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Theresa Davis Beaton on behalf of The Douglas Stewart Company, Inc. (Beaton, Theresa)
May 11, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #29 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (wwp)
May 11, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Transfer of Action re #36 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. (loh)
May 11, 2020 Filing 36 Case transfer in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:19-cv-00714. Case transferred electronically
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** The court was in the process of issuing its opinion and order granting defendant's motion to transfer the case when two more motions were filed. Defendant's motion to file a supplemental reply, Dkt. #32 , is denied as moot. Plaintiff's motion to compel, Dkt. #30 , is denied without prejudice to refiling it in the Southern District of Georgia. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/11/2020. (voc)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue to the Southern District of Georgia by Defendant HIQO Solutions, Inc. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 5/11/2020. (voc)
May 8, 2020 Filing 33 Notice by Plaintiff The Douglas Stewart Company, Inc. re #30 Motion to Compel Certification of Compliance with Rule 37(a). (Mark, Monica)
May 8, 2020 Filing 32 Motion for Leave to File Def's Supplemental Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by Defendant HIQO Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Def's Supplemental Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss) (Goins, Jonathan)
May 8, 2020 Filing 31 Declaration of Monica A. Mark filed by Plaintiff The Douglas Stewart Company, Inc. re: #30 Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - First Set of Written Discovery, #2 Exhibit B - Email Chain Feb. 10 2020, #3 Exhibit C - Responses to RFAs, #4 Exhibit D - Responses to ROGs, #5 Exhibit E - Responses to RFPs, #6 Exhibit F - Deficiency Letter, #7 Exhibit G - Email April 20, 2020, #8 Exhibit H - Email April 24, 2020, #9 Exhibit I - Email April 27, 2020, #10 Exhibit J - Email April 27, 2020, #11 Exhibit K - Email May 1, 2020, #12 Exhibit L - Email May 1, 2020, #13 Exhibit M - Email May 4, 2020, #14 Exhibit N - Email May 4, 2020) (Mark, Monica)
May 8, 2020 Filing 30 Motion to Compel by Plaintiff The Douglas Stewart Company, Inc.. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 5/15/2020. (Mark, Monica)
April 30, 2020 Filing 29 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Mark, Monica) Modified on 5/11/2020 (wwp).
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Defendant's motion to stay discovery is DENIED. Even if this court grants defendant's pending motion for a Rule 12(b)(b)(3) dismissal or a transfer, this lawsuit will go forward in a court somewhere. There is no reason to do absolutely nothing until venue is decided. The coronavirus pandemic is a wild card, but this court has decided that it is not a basis to stay cases or grant open-ended extensions. Within the bounds of safety and fairness, civil discovery must go forward. The parties have until April 30, 2020 to meet, confer and agree on a Rule 26(f)(3) discovery plan, or to submit their competing proposals to the court if agreement eludes them. If asked to choose a plan, the court will pick one, order it implemented without change, and impose Rule 37 costs on the losing party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 4/20/2020. (jls)
April 16, 2020 Filing 27 Declaration of Monica A. Mark filed by Plaintiff The Douglas Stewart Company, Inc. re: #24 Motion to Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - November 8, 2019 E-mail to HiQo Counsel, #2 Exhibit B - November 11, 2019 E-mail from Attorney Goins, #3 Exhibit C - November 11, 2019 E-mail from Attorney Polakowski, #4 Exhibit D - November 12, 2019 E-mail from Attorney Goins, #5 Exhibit E - November 13, 2019 E-mail from Attorney Mark, #6 Exhibit F - January 21, 2020 E-mail from Attorney Goins, #7 Exhibit G - January 21, 2020 E-mail from Attorney Mark, #8 Exhibit H - January 30, 2020 Follow-up E-mail from Attorney Mark, #9 Exhibit I - February 3, 2020 Additional Follow-up E-mail from Attorney Mark, #10 Exhibit J - February 4, 2020 E-mail from Attorney Goins, #11 Exhibit K - February 7, 2020 E-mail from Attorney Goins, #12 Exhibit L - February 10, 2020 E-mail from Attorney Mark, #13 Exhibit M - April 10, 2020 E-mail from Attorney Goins, #14 Exhibit N - ECF No. 32 in Goings v. UGN, Inc, No. 17-cv-09340 (N.D. Ill. Feb. 20, 2018), #15 Exhibit O - ECF No. 26 in City of Chicago v. Equifax, Inc., No. 17-cv-07798 (N.D. Ill. Nov. 26, 2017), #16 Exhibit P - Full Docket in Goings v. UGN, Inc.) (Mark, Monica)
April 16, 2020 Filing 26 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff The Douglas Stewart Company, Inc. re: #24 Motion to Stay filed by HIQO Solutions, Inc. (Mark, Monica)
April 9, 2020 Filing 25 Declaration of Jonathan D. Goins filed by Defendant HIQO Solutions, Inc. re: #24 Motion to Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket, #2 Exhibit B - Standing Order, #3 Exhibit C - Discovery Requests, #4 Exhibit D - Discovery Resp., #5 Exhibit E - Discovery Resp., #6 Exhibit F - Discovery Resp., #7 Exhibit G - Discovery Ltr, #8 Exhibit H - SD IL Order, #9 Exhibit I - ND IL Order, #10 Exhibit J - ND GA Order, #11 Exhibit K - SD GA Order, #12 Exhibit L - SD Ohio Order, #13 Exhibit M - Wisc Order, #14 Exhibit N - GA State of Emer.) (Goins, Jonathan)
April 9, 2020 Filing 24 Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer Venue by Defendant HIQO Solutions, Inc.. Response due 4/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Goins, Jonathan)
November 25, 2019 Filing 23 Brief in Reply by Defendant HIQO Solutions, Inc. in Support of #13 Motion to Dismiss. (Goins, Jonathan)
November 22, 2019 Filing 22 Disregard. Refer to #23 . Modified on 11/25/2019. (lak)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **At a November 22, 2019 telephonic status conference with counsel for both sides, the court set February 1, 2021 as the date for jury selection and trial in the event the court denies defendant's pending motion to dismiss or transfer venue (dkt. #13 ). The court did not stay discovery, but left it to the parties to meet and confer as to type and timing of any discovery pending resolution of the dismissal motion. The parties had no other matters to bring to the court's attention. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/22/2019. (jls)
November 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker: Telephone Status Conference held on 11/22/2019 [:15] (skv)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **Defendant's unopposed motion to postpone the telephonic preliminary pretrial conference is granted in part and denied in part. The November 22, 2019 telephonic pretrial conference is converted to a status and scheduling conference. The parties are excused from filing a Rule 26(f) report. At the November 22 conference, the court will set a trial date in early 2021 so that this case does not lose its place in line if defendant's motion to dismiss or transfer is denied, and the court will discuss with counsel whether a discovery stay is advisable. After deciding the dismissal/transfer motion the court will schedule a preliminary pretrial conference if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 11/15/2019. (jls) Modified on 11/15/2019 (jls).
November 14, 2019 Filing 19 Declaration of Jonathan Goins filed by Defendant HIQO Solutions, Inc. re: #18 Motion for Extension of Time, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Exchange of Emails, #2 Exhibit B - Representation of 11/13 Deposition, #3 Exhibit C - Representation of 11/14 Deposition, #4 Exhibit D - Travel Plans) (Goins, Jonathan) Modified on 11/15/2019. (lak)
November 14, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for the Parties' 26(f) Conference by Defendant HIQO Solutions, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Response due 11/21/2019. (Goins, Jonathan) Modified on 11/15/2019. (lak)
November 12, 2019 Filing 17 Declaration of Peter Collins filed by Plaintiff The Douglas Stewart Company, Inc. in Support of Plaintiff's Brief in Opposition re: #13 Motion to Dismiss. (Hutson-Polakowski, Jessica)
November 12, 2019 Filing 16 Brief in Opposition by Plaintiff The Douglas Stewart Company, Inc. re: #13 Motion to Dismiss, filed by HIQO Solutions, Inc. (Hutson-Polakowski, Jessica)
October 31, 2019 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance filed by Jessica Hutson-Polakowski for Plaintiff The Douglas Stewart Company, Inc. (Hutson-Polakowski, Jessica)
October 23, 2019 Set Telephone Pretrial Conference: Telephone Pretrial Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Counsel for Plaintiff responsible for setting up the call to chambers at (608) 264-5153. [#Standing Order Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference attached] (jls)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 Affidavit of Martin Mauersberg filed by Defendant HIQO Solutions, Inc. re: #13 Motion to Dismiss. (lak)
October 22, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS or in the Alternative Motion to Transfer Venue by Defendant HIQO Solutions, Inc. Brief in Opposition due 11/12/2019. Brief in Reply due 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Refer to #14 .) (Young, Timothy) Modified on 10/22/2019. (lak)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #11 Motion to Admit Jonathan D. Goins Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 10/2/2019. (lak)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to Admit Jonathan D. Goins Pro Hac Vice, ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2551687.), by Defendant HIQO Solutions, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Goins, Jonathan)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Complaint. HIQO Solutions, Inc. answer due 10/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 9/27/2019. (jls)
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant HIQO Solutions, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Young, Timothy) Modified on 9/27/2019: Missing paragraph 5. (lak)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Timothy J. Young for Defendant HIQO Solutions, Inc. (Young, Timothy)
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. HIQO Solutions, Inc. served on 9/10/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Mark, Monica)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 Disregard. To be refiled using Affidavit of Service event. Modified on 9/13/2019 (jls).
September 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to HIQO Solutions, Inc. (jls)
September 4, 2019 Standard attachments for Judge James D. Peterson required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (jls)
September 4, 2019 Case randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (jls)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 Exhibit to #1 Complaint, filed by The Douglas Stewart Company, Inc. (Mark, Monica)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons by Plaintiff The Douglas Stewart Company, Inc. (Mark, Monica) Modified on 9/3/2019: Missing case number. (lak)
September 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff The Douglas Stewart Company, Inc. (Mark, Monica) Modified on 9/3/2019: Missing case number. (lak)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HIQO Solutions, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0758-2532626.), filed by The Douglas Stewart Company, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Master Services Agreement) (Mark, Monica) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/3/2019: #2 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) Modified on 9/3/2019: Complaint is missing case number. (lak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Douglas Stewart Company, Inc. v. HIQO Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Douglas Stewart Company, Inc.
Represented By: Monica Ann Mark
Represented By: Jessica Hutson-Polakowski
Represented By: Jessica Polakowski
Represented By: James L. Roberts, IV
Represented By: Jessica Hutson Polakowski
Represented By: Theresa Davis Beaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIQO Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy J. Young
Represented By: Jonathan D. Goins
Represented By: Donavan K. Eason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?