Roehrkasse v. Savannah College of Art and Design
Plaintiff: Makari Roehrkasse
Defendant: Savannah College of Art and Design and Savannah College of Art and Design doing business as Savannah College of Art and Design
Case Number: 4:2020cv00116
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 7/6/2020. (ca)
June 18, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Makari Roehrkasse (Bowen, W.)
June 16, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul W. Painter, III on behalf of Makari Roehrkasse (Painter, Paul)
June 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by W. Andrew Bowen on behalf of Makari Roehrkasse (Bowen, W.)
June 11, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration. (loh)
June 10, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Savannah College of Art and Design. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - SCAD Handbook, #3 Exhibit B - Student Acknowledgement, #4 Exhibit C - M. Roehrkasse Acknowledgements, #5 Exhibit D - Arbitration Procedures, #6 Exhibit E - Arbitration Demand)(Mester, Mark)
June 10, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Savannah College of Art and Design. Responses due by 6/24/2020. (Mester, Mark)
June 10, 2020 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Savannah College of Art and Design. (Mester, Mark)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting re #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/3/2020. (loh)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting re #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/3/2020. (loh)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting re #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/3/2020. (loh)
June 2, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for (Heather A. Waller) Receipt Number AGASDC-2853971, Fee Amount $200, #10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for (Mark S. Mester), Receipt Number AGASDC-2853974, Fee Amount $200. (loh)
June 2, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for (Robert C. Collins). Receipt Number AGASDC-2853956, Fee Amount $200. (loh)
June 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark S. Mester Receipt Number AGASDC-2853974, Fee Amount $200, by Savannah College of Art and Design. Responses due by 6/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Local Rule 83.4 List of Prior Cases)(Mason, Kirby) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2020: #3 Corrected Motion) (loh).
June 2, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Heather A. Waller Receipt Number AGASDC-2853971, Fee Amount $200, by Savannah College of Art and Design. Responses due by 6/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Local Rule 83.4 List of Prior Cases)(Mason, Kirby) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2020: #3 Corrected Motion) (loh).
June 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert C. Collins Receipt Number AGASDC-2853956, Fee Amount $200, by Savannah College of Art and Design. Responses due by 6/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Local Rule 83.4 List of Prior Cases)(Mason, Kirby) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2020: #3 Corrected Motion) (loh).
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Certification of Notification to Superior Court of Chatham County re #1 Notice of Removal by Savannah College of Art and Design. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal - Sup. Ct. Clerk. #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal - Sup. Ct. Judges)(Mason, Kirby)
June 1, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Savannah College of Art and Design answer due 6/18/2020. (jrb)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirby G. Mason on behalf of Savannah College of Art and Design (Mason, Kirby)
May 29, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Savannah College of Art and Design answer due 6/4/2020. Motions due by 6/11/2020. (loh)
May 29, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Appearance/ Pro Hac Vice Motion due by 6/8/2020. Compliance due by 6/8/2020. (loh)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #1 Notice of Removal. (loh)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 5/29/2020. (loh)
May 29, 2020 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (loh)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 Statement of Motions Pending. (loh)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE to Attorneys re #1 Notice of Removal, by Savannah College of Art and Design. (loh)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Savannah College of Art and Design from Superior Court of Chatham County, case number SPCV20-00377-MO. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGASDC-2851707). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Registered Agent Information, #3 Exhibit C-SCAD Family Guide, #4 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Superior Court Judges, #5 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Superior Court Clerk, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roehrkasse v. Savannah College of Art and Design
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Makari Roehrkasse
Represented By: Paul W. Painter, III
Represented By: W. Andrew Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savannah College of Art and Design
Represented By: David Michael Burkoff
Represented By: Kirby G. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Savannah College of Art and Design doing business as Savannah College of Art and Design
Represented By: David Michael Burkoff
Represented By: Kirby G. Mason
Represented By: Robert C. Collins, III
Represented By: Mark S. Mester
Represented By: Heather A. Waller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?