Auto-Owners Life Insurance Company v. The Estate of Stanley Ray Lovett, Jr. et al
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Lynda Catherine Moore, The Estate of Stanley Ray Lovett, Jr., Brandi Taylor, Ilaree Tillman Cobb and Ashley Lovett
Case Number: 4:2020cv00129
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E. Scheer on behalf of Ilaree Tillman Cobb (Scheer, Steven)
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Deposit Funds filed by Ilaree Tillman Cobb. (Call, Craig)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 Litigants' Bill of Rights pursuant to 7.1.1 filed by Ilaree Tillman Cobb. (Call, Craig) Modified on 8/6/2020 (csr).
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Auto-Owners Life Insurance Company by Ilaree Tillman Cobb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rule 11 Notice to Plaintiff)(Call, Craig)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint and Standing Order served on Ilaree Cobb on July 28, 2020, filed by Auto-Owners Life Insurance Company. (Atkins, Sabrina)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting re #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jessica M. Phillips. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/24/2020. (loh) Modified on 6/25/2020 (loh).
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jessica M. Phillps Receipt Number AGASDC-2867303, Fee Amount $200, by Auto-Owners Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Atkins, Sabrina)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Auto-Owners Life Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Atkins, Sabrina)
June 16, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Auto-Owners Life Insurance Company. Brandi Taylor served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/3/2020. (Atkins, Sabrina)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/10/20. (wwp)
June 10, 2020 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Taylor, #2 Summons Cobb, #3 Summons Moore, #4 Lovett)(wwp)
June 10, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number BGASDC-2859387. (wwp)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for interpleader against Ilaree Tillman Cobb, Ashley Lovett, Lynda Catherine Moore, Brandi Taylor, The Estate of Stanley Ray Lovett, Jr., filed by Auto-Owners Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Auto-Owners Life Insurance Company v. The Estate of Stanley Ray Lovett, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynda Catherine Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Stanley Ray Lovett, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandi Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ilaree Tillman Cobb
Represented By: Craig Alan Call
Represented By: Steven E. Scheer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Lovett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auto-Owners Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Sabrina Lynn Atkins
Represented By: Jessica M. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?