Barney et al v. Peters. M.D. et al
Plaintiff: Frank M. Barney and Soncera Kimberly Barney
Defendant: Real Radiology, LLC, John Does 1-5, Gregory T. Peters. M.D. and John Does, Inc's. 1-5
Case Number: 4:2020cv00173
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Manual Filing by Gregory T. Peters. M.D. re #26 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof (Joyce, Carlton)
September 25, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #25 Joint MOTION to Seal. (loh)
September 25, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof by Gregory T. Peters. M.D.. Responses due by 10/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted, #2 Exhibit B - Subject to Parties' Joint Motion to Seal, #3 Exhibit C - Redacted)(Joyce, Carlton)
September 25, 2020 Filing 25 Joint MOTION to Seal by Gregory T. Peters. M.D.. Responses due by 10/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Joyce, Carlton)
September 24, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION Joint Consent Motion to Proceed before Magistrate Judge by Real Radiology, LLC. Responses due by 10/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Consent Motion to Proceed before Magistrate Judge)(Bailey, M.)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2020. Discovery due by 10/1/2020. Motions due by 3/31/2021. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 11/2/2020. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 1/8/2021. Status Report due by 3/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 9/17/2020. (loh)
September 16, 2020 Filing 22 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/16/2020. (MD)
September 14, 2020 Filing 21 TEXT ONLY NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2020 09:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray. Parties will be contacted by email with dial-in instructions. (MD)
September 11, 2020 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Frank M. Barney, Soncera Kimberly Barney. (Stafford, H.)
September 3, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (loh)
September 3, 2020 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Bailey, M.)
August 25, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Alternative Dispute Resolution and Case Management Procedures by Frank M. Barney, Soncera Kimberly Barney. (Stafford, H.)
August 14, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Discovery re 16 Deposition. (loh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2020: #1 Correct Notice) (loh).
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting re #10 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney B. Nicole Smith for Real Radiology, LLC. Attorney Carlton Edward Joyce terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/4/2020. (loh)
August 5, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by H. Craig Stafford on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Stafford, H.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/6/2020: #1 Corrected PDF) (ca).
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew S. Johnson on behalf of Frank M. Barney, Soncera Kimberly Barney (Johnson, Andrew)
August 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery L. Arnold on behalf of Frank M. Barney, Soncera Kimberly Barney (Arnold, Jeffery)
August 4, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 First MOTION to Substitute Attorney Carlton E. Joyce. (loh)
August 4, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION to Substitute Attorney Carlton E. Joyce by Real Radiology, LLC. Responses due by 8/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bailey, M.)
July 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Certificate of Compliance with Requirement to Give Notice of Removal by Gregory T. Peters. M.D., Real Radiology, LLC. (Joyce, Carlton)
July 31, 2020 Filing 8 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gregory T. Peters. M.D., Real Radiology, LLC. (Joyce, Carlton)
July 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Motions Pending by Gregory T. Peters. M.D., Real Radiology, LLC. (Joyce, Carlton)
July 31, 2020 Filing 6 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Real Radiology, LLC. (Joyce, Carlton)
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Gregory T. Peters. M.D.. (Joyce, Carlton)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Gregory T. Peters. M.D., Real Radiology, LLC. (Joyce, Carlton)
July 31, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Appearance/Pro Hac Vice Motion due by 8/10/2020. Compliance due by 8/10/2020. (loh)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #1 Notice of Removal. (loh)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 7/31/2020. (loh)
July 31, 2020 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (loh)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Gregory T. Peters. M.D., Real Radiology, LLC from State Court of Liberty County, Georgia, case number STCV2020000143. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGASDC-2893164). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- State Complaint, Answer, and Summons, #2 Affidavit of Gregory T. Peters, M.D., #3 Affidavit of Philip Pullum, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barney et al v. Peters. M.D. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank M. Barney
Represented By: Jeffery L. Arnold
Represented By: Andrew S. Johnson
Represented By: H. Craig Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soncera Kimberly Barney
Represented By: Jeffery L. Arnold
Represented By: Andrew S. Johnson
Represented By: H. Craig Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Radiology, LLC
Represented By: Carlton Edward Joyce
Represented By: Max Mathew Wallace, II
Represented By: M. Scott Bailey
Represented By: B. Nicole Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory T. Peters. M.D.
Represented By: Carlton Edward Joyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does, Inc's. 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?