Liberty Corporate Capital, LTD v. First Metropolitan Baptist Church et al
Plaintiff: Liberty Corporate Capital, LTD
Defendant: Jane Doe, First Metropolitan Baptist Church and Alfonza McClendon, Sr.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00179
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Corporate Capital, LTD. Alfonza McClendon, Sr served on 9/12/2020, answer due 10/3/2020. (Mast, Gregory)
October 5, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liberty Corporate Capital, LTD. First Metropolitan Baptist Church served on 9/12/2020, answer due 10/3/2020. (Mast, Gregory)
October 5, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE by Liberty Corporate Capital, LTD re #17 MOTION to Seal Document of Disclosure of Identity - Non-Opposition (Mast, Gregory)
October 2, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint by First Metropolitan Baptist Church.(Blackburn, James)
October 2, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 MOTION to Seal Document of Disclosure of Identity. (JH)
October 1, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Seal Document of Disclosure of Identity by Jane Doe. Responses due by 10/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Kelly, Roy)
September 18, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Liberty Corporate Capital, LTD.(Mast, Gregory)
September 16, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by James B. Blackburn, Jr on behalf of First Metropolitan Baptist Church (Blackburn, James)
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Roy Robinson Kelly, IV on behalf of Jane Doe (Kelly, Roy)
September 1, 2020 Filing 13 Defendant Jane Doe's ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, COUNTERCLAIM against Liberty Corporate Capital, LTD by Jane Doe.(Murphy, Owen)
August 27, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to First Metropolitan Baptist Church, Alfonza McClendon, Sr. (JH)
August 27, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Submitted (Burke, Kamber)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Submitted (Burke, Kamber)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Liberty Corporate Capital, LTD. (Mast, Gregory)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kamber S. Burke on behalf of Liberty Corporate Capital, LTD (Burke, Kamber)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting re #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/19/2020. (loh)
August 18, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2905198, Fee Amount $200. (JH)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number AGASDC-2905198, Fee Amount $200, by Liberty Corporate Capital, LTD. Responses due by 8/31/2020. (Mast, Gregory)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Liberty Corporate Capital, LTD identifying Liberty Corporate Capital, Ltd. as Corporate Parent.. (Mast, Gregory)
August 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing by Liberty Corporate Capital, LTD re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K - June 23, 2020 ROR)(Mast, Gregory)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 8/7/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (wwp)
August 7, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number agasdc - 2898474. (wwp)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jane Doe, First Metropolitan Baptist Church, Alfonza McClendon, Sr, filed by Liberty Corporate Capital, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2011 Policy, #2 Exhibit B - 2012 Policy, #3 Exhibit C - 2013 Policy, #4 Exhibit D - 2014 Policy, #5 Exhibit E - 2015 Policy, #6 Exhibit F - 2016 Policy, #7 Exhibit G - 2017 Policy, #8 Exhibit H - 2018 Policy, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Corporate Capital, LTD v. First Metropolitan Baptist Church et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Represented By: Owen C. Murphy
Represented By: Roy Robinson Kelly, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Metropolitan Baptist Church
Represented By: James B. Blackburn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfonza McClendon, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Corporate Capital, LTD
Represented By: Gregory Lee Mast
Represented By: Kamber S. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?