Ruffin-Chapman v. Walmart Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mikysha Ruffin-Chapman
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP doing business as Wal-Mart Store #01-02860, John Does 1-10, Walmart Inc. doing business as Wal-Mart Stores #01-02860 and John Does Nos. 1-10
Case Number: 4:2020cv00220
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/13/2020. Discovery due by 1/5/2021. Motions due by 6/4/2021. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 3/5/2021. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 4/5/2021. Status Report due by 5/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/22/20. (wwp)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Discovery Restriction re #10 . (JH)
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dizon, Camille)
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 ***Docketed in Error*** (JH).
October 19, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting, #10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (maa)
September 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Cameron on behalf of Mikysha Ruffin-Chapman (Cameron, Ashley)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Dustin W. Hamilton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Hamilton, Dustin)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Camille D. Dizon on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc. (Dizon, Camille)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc..(Miller, Michael)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Miller, Michael)
September 14, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc. identifying WAL-MART STORES, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (Miller, Michael)
September 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #1 Notice of Removal. (loh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2020: #1 Corrected Notice) (loh).
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 9/14/2020. (loh)
September 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from State Court of Chatham County, case number STCV20-01291. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGASDC-2923116). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons, Complaint, Answer, and Notice, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh)
September 14, 2020 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (loh)
September 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Appearance/Pro Hac Vice Motion due by 9/24/2020. Compliance due by 9/24/2020. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruffin-Chapman v. Walmart Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP doing business as Wal-Mart Store #01-02860
Represented By: Camille D. Dizon
Represented By: Michael L. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc. doing business as Wal-Mart Stores #01-02860
Represented By: Camille D. Dizon
Represented By: Michael L. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does Nos. 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikysha Ruffin-Chapman
Represented By: Ashley Cameron
Represented By: Dustin W. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?