Hutto v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Plaintiff: Edward Hutto
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP doing business as Walmart Supercenter #635
Case Number: 4:2020cv00241
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting re #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 3/10/21. (loh)
March 10, 2021 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Remaining Deadlines by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. Responses due by 3/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Modified Scheduling Order)(Meader, Garret)
March 10, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Remaining Deadlines. (wwp)
March 10, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 5/10/2021. Motions due by 6/9/2021. Status Report due by 5/24/2021. (loh)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2020. Discovery due by 3/10/2021. Motions due by 4/9/2021. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 12/21/2020. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 1/21/2021. Status Report due by 3/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Trial Information, #2 Joint Status Report) (loh)
October 22, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 11/4/2020. (wwp)
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Meader, Garret)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #1 Notice of Removal. (loh)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(loh)
October 2, 2020 Filing 5 Statement of Motions Pending. (loh)
October 2, 2020 Filing 4 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (loh)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (loh)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 10/2/2020. (loh)
October 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from State Court of Chatham County, case number STCV2001496. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGASDC-2937722). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh)
October 2, 2020 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutto v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP doing business as Walmart Supercenter #635
Represented By: Garret W. Meader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Hutto
Represented By: Albert Maitland Yates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?