Oliver v. Ameris Bank et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Oliver
Defendant: Geovista Credit Union, Equifax Information Solutions, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC, Chex Systems, Inc. and Ameris Bank
Case Number: 4:2020cv00273
Filed: November 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Filing 43 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Equifax Information Solutions, LLC. Amendment to #42 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Amended COS. (Loebl, Michael)
December 29, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #42 MOTION to Stay Proceedings. (MG)
December 28, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Responses due by 1/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(Loebl, Michael)
December 28, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION to Strike Defendant Ameris Banks' Response Pleading #30 MOTION to Dismiss, and MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment Against Defendant Ameris Bank, by Anthony Oliver. Responses due by 1/11/2021. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (MG)
December 18, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint by Anthony Oliver. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH)
December 17, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Middle District of Georgia by Anthony Oliver. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH)
December 15, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Withdraw #10 MOTION to Dismiss and Renewed Motion to Dismiss #30 by Ameris Bank. Responses due by 12/29/2020. (Pedigo, Jason)
December 15, 2020 Filing 37 OBJECTION to #23 Report and Recommendations by Ameris Bank. (Pedigo, Jason)
December 15, 2020 Filing 36 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Ameris Bank. (Pedigo, Jason)
December 15, 2020 Filing 35 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Ameris Bank.(Pedigo, Jason)
December 15, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Settlement as to Trans Union LLC Only by Trans Union, LLC (Lyon, Emery)
December 8, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Anthony Oliver. (wwp)
December 7, 2020 Filing 32 AMENDED Certificate of Service by Ameris Bank. Amendment to #30 MOTION to Dismiss. (Pedigo, Jason)
December 7, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Anthony Oliver. (wwp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2020: #1 Envelope) (wwp).
December 4, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss by Ameris Bank. Responses due by 12/18/2020. (Pedigo, Jason)
December 4, 2020 Filing 29 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Geovista Credit Union. (Davis, L.)
December 4, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Trans Union, LLC.(Lyon, Emery)
December 4, 2020 Filing 27 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Chex Systems, Inc..(Jett, John)
December 4, 2020 Filing 26 Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Loebl, Michael)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER VACATING AS MOOT re #24 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 12/03/2020. (JH)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 (VACATED AS MOOT per #25 ) ORDER DIRECTING Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. to amend re #1 Notice of Removal within 14 days of this Order to comply with the requirements of 1446(a), including the filing of the state court record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 12/02/2020. (JH) Modified on 12/3/2020 (JH).
December 1, 2020 Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of the U.S. Magistrate Judge re #22 MOTION to Suspend Bond Requirement recommending plaintiff may move for the bond to be waived. Such motion must also be accompanied by a copy of his prisoner trust fund account statement. The bond should be SUSPENDED pending the disposition of the motion. Objections to R&R due by 12/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 12/01/2020. (JH)
December 1, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Suspend Bond Requirements by Anthony Oliver. Responses due by 12/15/2020. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH)
December 1, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE filed by Anthony Oliver. (JH)
December 1, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Defendant Geovista Credit Union by Anthony Oliver. Responses due by 12/15/2020. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH)
December 1, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Service by Anthony Oliver. REFERRED to Judge Christopher L. Ray. (JH)
November 20, 2020 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ameris Bank, Chex Systems, Inc., Equifax Information Solutions, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Geovista Credit Union, Trans Union, LLC, filed by Anthony Oliver.(wwp)
November 18, 2020 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Loebl, Michael)
November 18, 2020 Filing 16 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Loebl, Michael)
November 16, 2020 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Geovista Credit Union. (Davis, L.)
November 16, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Geovista Credit Union.(Davis, L.)
November 16, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Chex Systems, Inc.. Responses due by 11/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Briefs)(Jett, John)
November 13, 2020 Filing 12 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Ameris Bank. (Pedigo, Jason)
November 12, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing by Chex Systems, Inc. Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Motion to Dismiss)(Jett, John)
November 12, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Ameris Bank. Responses due by 11/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A Declaration of J.Exum)(Pedigo, Jason)
November 12, 2020 Filing 9 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Trans Union, LLC. (Lyon, Emery)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Trans Union, LLC. (Lyon, Emery)
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant Trans Union LLC's Answer and Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union, LLC.(Lyon, Emery)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Loebl, Michael)
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Jett on behalf of Chex Systems, Inc. (Jett, John)
November 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (Loebl, Michael)
November 5, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 11/12/2020. (loh)
November 5, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Clerk's Dismissal by 12/5/2020. (loh)
November 5, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Bond Requirements Due due by 11/19/2020. (loh)
November 5, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Notice of Appearance/Pro Hac Vice Motion due by 10/15/2020. Compliance due by 10/15/2020. (loh)
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #1 Notice of Removal. (loh)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 11/5/2020. (loh)
November 5, 2020 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (loh)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Experian Information Solutions, Inc., from Superior Court of Chatham County, State of Georgia, case number SPCV20-00752-WA. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AGASDC-2958921). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(loh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oliver v. Ameris Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geovista Credit Union
Represented By: L. Kelly Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Michael N. Loebl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Emery Lyon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chex Systems, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Jett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameris Bank
Represented By: Jason Carl Pedigo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Oliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?