Cherry v. Hyatt Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Lisa D. Cherry
Defendant: Hyatt Corporation doing business as Hyatt Regency Savannah, Kone, Inc, Amir Blattner and HHC TRS Savannah, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv00278
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jonathan Friedman Receipt Number AGASDC-2997319, Fee Amount $200, by HHC TRS Savannah, LLC, Hyatt Corporation. Responses due by 1/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Vuchinich, Jason) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2020: #3 Statement of Prior Cases) (JH).
December 29, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jonathan Friedman Receipt Number AGASDC-2997319, Fee Amount $200. (JH)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 1/18/2021, Discovery due by 7/16/2021, Motions due by 8/16/2021, Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 4/15/2021, Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 6/15/2021, Status Report due by 7/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 12/17/2020. (pts)
December 17, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (pts)
December 16, 2020 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Vuchinich, Jason)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Melissa E. Roque Paskow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on December 15, 2020. (jrb)
December 11, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Melissa Roque Receipt Number AGASDC-2984418, Fee Amount $200. (JH)
December 10, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Melissa Roque Receipt Number AGASDC-2984418, Fee Amount $200, by HHC TRS Savannah, LLC, Hyatt Corporation. Responses due by 12/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from the Middle District of Florida, #2 List of All Cases, #3 Proposed Order of Admission)(Vuchinich, Jason)
December 2, 2020 Filing 14 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Kone, Inc. (Campbell, John)
December 2, 2020 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kone, Inc identifying Kone Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Campbell, John)
November 30, 2020 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by HHC TRS Savannah, LLC, Hyatt Corporation. (Vuchinich, Jason)
November 20, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Kone, Inc.(Campbell, John)
November 19, 2020 Filing 10 Statement of Motions Pending . (Vuchinich, Jason)
November 19, 2020 Filing 9 Litigants' Bill of Rights by HHC TRS Savannah, LLC. (Vuchinich, Jason)
November 17, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by HHC TRS Savannah, LLC.(Vuchinich, Jason)
November 17, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Hyatt Corporation.(Vuchinich, Jason)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 Litigants' Bill of Rights by Lisa D. Cherry. (Withrow, Daphne)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 ***Entered in Error*** (JH)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to all counsel re #1 Notice of Removal. Set/Reset Deadlines: HHC TRS Savannah, LLC answer due 11/17/2020; Hyatt Corporation answer due 11/17/2020. State Motions due by 11/20/2020. (wwp) Modified on 11/10/2020 (wwp).
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 11/10/20. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (wwp)
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HHC TRS Savannah, LLC, Hyatt Corporation from State Court of Chatham County, case number STCV20-01686. (Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AGASDC - 2692069), filed by HHC TRS Savannah, LLC, Hyatt Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleading, State Complaint, answer, summons, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit C - Demand Letter, #5 Exhibit D Consent to Removal)(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cherry v. Hyatt Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyatt Corporation doing business as Hyatt Regency Savannah
Represented By: Jason T. Vuchinich
Represented By: Melissa E. Roque Paskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kone, Inc
Represented By: John W. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amir Blattner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HHC TRS Savannah, LLC
Represented By: Jason T. Vuchinich
Represented By: Melissa E. Roque Paskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa D. Cherry
Represented By: Daphne S. Withrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?