Brooks et al v. Mahoney,III et al.,
Plaintiff: James Martin, III, Nicole Martin, Rebecca Brooks and Stuart Abel, III
Defendant: Thomas Mahoney, III, Patricia Pullar, Tim McFalls, Terence Dicks, John Mangano, Andy Callaway, Dele Lowman Smith, Diane Givens, Samuel E. Tillman, Aaron Johnson, Wandy Taylor, Becky Vu, Fred Aiken, Mildred Schmelz, Brad Raffensperger, Antwan Lang, Susan Motter, Bob Finnegan, Malinda Hodge, Carol Wesley, Darlene Johnson, Donna Morris-McBride, Alice O'Lenick, Darryl O. Wilson, Phil Daniell, Marianne Heimes, Arch Brown, Brian Kemp, Ben Satterfield, Dorothy Foster Hall, Marcia Brown, Pat Gartland, Anthony Lewis, Jessica M. Brooks, Debbie Rauers, Stephen W. Day, Sherry T. Barnes, Mark Wingate, Kathleen Ruth, Mary Carole Cooney and Vernetta Keith Nuriddin
Not Yet Classified: James Woodall, Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Melvin Ivey, Helen Butler and Democratic Party of Georgia
Case Number: 4:2020cv00281
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. The Court authorizes and directs the Clerk of Court to terminate all pending motions. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 11/16/20. (wwp) Modified on 11/16/2020 (wwp).
November 16, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Stuart Abel, III, Rebecca Brooks, James Martin, III, Nicole Martin (Smith, Ray)
November 14, 2020 Filing 19 Proposed MOTION to Dismiss by Helen Butler, Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Melvin Ivey, James Woodall. Responses due by 11/28/2020. (Sandick, Philip)
November 14, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Intervene by Georgia State Conference of the NAACP, Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda, James Woodall, Helen Butler, Melvin Ivey. Responses due by 11/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of James Woodall, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Helen Butler, #3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Melvin Ivey)(Sandick, Philip)
November 13, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Democratic Party of Georgia of Request for Oral Argument (Baiad, Todd)
November 13, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Expedite Schedule and Discovery filed by Democratic Party of Georgia. (Baiad, Todd)
November 13, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss (Proposed) by Democratic Party of Georgia. Responses due by 11/27/2020. (Baiad, Todd)
November 13, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kevin Hamilton Receipt Number AGASDC-2965550, Fee Amount $200, by Democratic Party of Georgia. Responses due by 11/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Hamilton, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order - Hamilton)(Baiad, Todd)
November 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Amanda Beane Receipt Number AGASDC-2965549, Fee Amount $200, by Democratic Party of Georgia. Responses due by 11/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Beane, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order - Beane)(Baiad, Todd)
November 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Amanda Callais Receipt Number BGASDC-2965548, Fee Amount $200, by Democratic Party of Georgia. Responses due by 11/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Callais, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order - Callais)(Baiad, Todd)
November 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Marc Elias Receipt Number AGASDC-2965547, Fee Amount $200, by Democratic Party of Georgia. Responses due by 11/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Admitting Elias)(Baiad, Todd)
November 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Intervene by Democratic Party of Georgia. Responses due by 11/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Answer of Proposed Intervenor DPG)(Baiad, Todd)
November 13, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED: #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James Bopp, Jr. Receipt Number AGASDC-2963993, Fee Amount $200,, #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Melena S. Seibert Receipt Number AGASDC-2963998, Fee Amount $200. (wwp)
November 12, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT to Correct Certificate of Service for Original Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Nicole Martin, Rebecca Brooks, Stuart Abel, III, James Martin, III.(Smith, Ray)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing deficiency re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Melena S. Seibert Receipt Number AGASDC-2963998, Fee Amount $200. (wwp) Modified on 11/12/2020 (wwp).
November 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James Bopp, Jr. Receipt Number AGASDC-2963993, Fee Amount $200. (wwp)
November 12, 2020 Filing 6 ******* MOTION to Expedite Schedule and Discovery by Stuart Abel, III, Rebecca Brooks, James Martin, III, Nicole Martin. Responses due by 11/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Expedite and Discovery, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Scheduling Conference)(Smith, Ray)
November 12, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Melena S. Seibert Receipt Number AGASDC-2963998, Fee Amount $200, by Stuart Abel, III, Rebecca Brooks, James Martin, III, Nicole Martin. Responses due by 11/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Smith, Ray) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2020: #2 Main document, #3 List of) (wwp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2020: #4 Certificate of Good Standing) (wwp).
November 12, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James Bopp, Jr. Receipt Number AGASDC-2963993, Fee Amount $200, by Stuart Abel, III, Rebecca Brooks, James Martin, III, Nicole Martin. Responses due by 11/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Courts in Which Petitioner is Admitted, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Smith, Ray) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2020: #3 Main document) (wwp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2020: #4 List of cases practiced in SDGA) (wwp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2020: #5 Certificate of Good Standing) (wwp).
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 11/12/20. (wwp)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp)
November 12, 2020 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number AGASDC - 2963610. (wwp)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Rebecca Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of James Bopp, Jr. - Law Officer Article, #3 Exhibit 2to Declaration of James Bopp, Jr. Judicial Watch Study, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of James Bopp, Jr. - Just Facts Article, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of James Bopp, Jr. - Wall Street Journal Article, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of James Bopp, Jr. - National Pulse Article, #7 Affidavit Declaration of James Bopp, Jr)(wwp) Modified on 11/12/2020 (wwp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks et al v. Mahoney,III et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Mahoney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Pullar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim McFalls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terence Dicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Mangano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Callaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dele Lowman Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel E. Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wandy Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Vu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Aiken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mildred Schmelz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Raffensperger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antwan Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Motter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malinda Hodge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Wesley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Morris-McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice O'Lenick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl O. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Daniell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marianne Heimes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Satterfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorothy Foster Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Gartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica M. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Rauers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen W. Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry T. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Wingate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Ruth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Carole Cooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vernetta Keith Nuriddin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Martin, III
Represented By: Ray S. Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Martin
Represented By: Ray S. Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Brooks
Represented By: Ray S. Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart Abel, III
Represented By: Ray S. Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: James Woodall
Represented By: Philip Aaron Sandick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Georgia State Conference of the NAACP
Represented By: Philip Aaron Sandick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Georgia Coalition for the People's Agenda
Represented By: Philip Aaron Sandick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Melvin Ivey
Represented By: Philip Aaron Sandick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Helen Butler
Represented By: Philip Aaron Sandick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Democratic Party of Georgia
Represented By: Todd Michael Baiad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?