Harley v. Isael Gonzalez et al
Plaintiff: Bobbie D. Harley
Defendant: Agape Xpress, Inc., Isael Gonzalez and National Transportation Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, LLC
Case Number: 4:2021cv00065
Filed: March 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Join Dante Russo as a Party Defendant . (cmr)
May 6, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Join Dante Russo as a Party Defendant by Bobbie D. Harley. Responses due by 5/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Police Report, #2 Exhibit B - Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Removal Notice, #4 Text of Proposed Order D - Proposed Order)(Savage, Brent)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/10/2021. Discovery due by 5/31/2021. Motions due by 9/17/2021. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 7/12/2021. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 7/26/2021. Status Report due by 9/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/8/21. (wwp)
April 6, 2021 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Savage, Brent)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED that the parties are DIRECTED to file a revised Rule 26(f) Report no later than Friday, April 9, 2021 proposing conforming dates or providing good cause for why deviation from the standard sequence is appropriate in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/6/21. (loh)
April 6, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 4/9/2021. (loh)
April 6, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (jrb)
April 5, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (thb)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Savage, Brent)
March 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent J. Savage on behalf of Bobbie D. Harley (Savage, Brent)
March 15, 2021 Filing 4 ***ENTERED IN ERROR***NOTICE of Appearance by Brent J. Savage on behalf of Bobbie D. Harley (Savage, Brent) Modified on 3/17/2021 (thb).
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26 INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 3/10/2021. (JH)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD re #1 Notice of Removal. Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' answer due by 3/16/2021. Notice of Appearance or Pro Hac Vice due by 3/20/2021. Motions due by 3/24/2021. (JH)
March 10, 2021 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (JH)
March 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Transportation Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, LLC, Agape Xpress, Inc., Isael Gonzalez from State Court of Chatham County, case number STCV21-00208. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGASDC-3056407) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Plaintiff's First Interrog. to Isael Gonzalez, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Docs to Isael Gonzalez, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Plaintiff's First Interrog. to Agape Xpress, Inc., #5 Exhibit E - State Court Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Docs to Agape Express, Inc., #6 Exhibit F - State Court Plaintiff's First Interrog. to National Transport, #7 Exhibit G - State Court Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Docs to National Transport, #8 Exhibit H - State Court Answer of Defendants, #9 Exhibit I - Affidavit of Thomas E. Brennan, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (JH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harley v. Isael Gonzalez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agape Xpress, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas E. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isael Gonzalez
Represented By: Thomas E. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Transportation Insurance Company Risk Retention Group, LLC
Represented By: Thomas E. Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie D. Harley
Represented By: Brent Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?