Alleman v. Carrabba's Italian Grill, LLC, (Florida)
Plaintiff: Tawna Alleman
Defendant: Carrabba's Italian Grill, LLC, (Florida)
Case Number: 4:2021cv00068
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carrabba's Italian Grill, LLC, (Florida) identifying Bloomin' Brands, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (Terrett, Craig)
April 26, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #8 Order, filed by Carrabba's Italian Grill, LLC, (Florida). (Terrett, Craig)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED that Defendant Carrabba's Italian Grill is DIRECTED to file within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order an amended notice of removal that lists the citizenships of its members re #1 Notice of Removal. Signed by Judge William T. Moore, Jr on 4/13/21. (loh)
April 13, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Notice of Removal due by 4/27/2021. (loh)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 5/10/2021. Discovery due by 10/5/2021. Motions due by 11/4/2021. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 7/1/2021. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 9/1/2021. Status Report due by 10/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 4/9/21. (Attachments: #1 Civil Trial Information, #2 Joint Status) (loh)
April 9, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (cmr)
April 8, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Degenhart, William)
March 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by William Jarrell Degenhart on behalf of Tawna Alleman (Degenhart, William)
March 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE to all counsel of record that a #1 Notice of Removal has been docketed in the Southern District of Georgia. Set/Reset Deadlines: State Motions due by 3/21/2021. (wwp)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 3/11/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (wwp)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carrabba's Italian Grill, LLC, (Florida) from State of Chatham County, case number STCV20-02362. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BGASDC 3057888), filed by Carrabba's Italian Grill, LLC, (Florida). Exhibit A: State Summons, State Complaint, State Discovery, State Answer, EXHIBIT B: Notice of Filing Removal, Exhibit C: Offer of Settlement. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alleman v. Carrabba's Italian Grill, LLC, (Florida)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrabba's Italian Grill, LLC, (Florida)
Represented By: Craig P. Terrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawna Alleman
Represented By: William Jarrell Degenhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?