One Hundred Miles v. The United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Plaintiff: One Hundred Miles
Defendant: The United States Army Corps of Engineers and Colonel Daniel Hibner
Case Number: 4:2021cv00134
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: R Stan Baker
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting re #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Daniel Hibner answer due 8/6/2021; The United States Army Corps of Engineers answer due 8/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/24/21. (loh)
June 24, 2021 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Daniel Hibner, The United States Army Corps of Engineers. Responses due by 7/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Swanson, Kristofor)
June 24, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (slt)
May 24, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, held on May 20, 2021, before Judge R. Stan Baker. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kelly A. McKee, Telephone number 912-650-4065. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. (Transcript Redaction Policy Issued or Click here to view #Transcript Redaction Policy) Redaction Request due 6/14/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/24/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/22/2021. (McKee, Kelly)
May 20, 2021 Filing 14 Exhibit and Witness List for Motion Hearing held on 5/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Exhibit D, #2 Defendant's Exhibit E, #3 Defendant's Exhibit F)(pmh)
May 20, 2021 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge R. Stan Baker: Motion Hearing re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction held on 5/20/2021. (Court Reporter Kelly McKee.) (pmh)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order ORAL ORDER. For all of the reasons stated on the record and those stated in the Plaintiff's pleadings, the Court GRANTS the Plaintiff's #5 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. The Court orders that the Defendants shall not conduct dredging activities using a hopper dredge during the period of April 1 to December 14 in the area in question during the pendency of this lawsuit. Entered by District Judge R. Stan Baker on May 20, 2021. (pmh)
May 18, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by One Hundred Miles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 23 - Second Ridley Declaration)(Huynh, Megan)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting re #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 5/17/21. (loh)
May 14, 2021 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Daniel Hibner, The United States Army Corps of Engineers. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - 1998 Chief Engineers' Report, #2 Ex. B - Georgia Ports Economic Impact Study, #3 Ex. C - 2020 SARBO excerpts, #4 Broadie Declaration, #5 Brutsche Declaration, #6 Richards Declaration, #7 Scerno Declaration)(Swanson, Kristofor)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert David Sherrier Receipt Number AGASDC-3103966, Fee Amount $200, by One Hundred Miles. Responses due by 5/27/2021. (Huynh, Megan)
May 13, 2021 MOTIONS REFERRED: #9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Robert David Sherrier (slt)
May 11, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #5 MOTION Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. The Motion Hearing is set for 5/20/2021 09:00 AM in Savannah - 1st Floor before District Judge R. Stan Baker. (pmh)For public access to this hearing, please dial 888-684-8852, and enter the call access code: 9717475.NOTICE OF ORDER REGARDING IN-PERSON HEARINGS before the Honorable R. Stan Baker in light of the Coronavirus (COVID-19) Pandemic. (4:20-mc-5) Please read important information elucidating the requirements for Judge R. Stan Baker's in-person hearings. Individuals that do not abide by the requirements will not be admitted to the hearing. #CLICK HERE TO READ.
May 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristofor Swanson on behalf of Daniel Hibner, The United States Army Corps of Engineers (Swanson, Kristofor)
May 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Otto Woelke Leithart on behalf of All Defendants (Leithart, Otto)
May 4, 2021 Filing 8 Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge R. Stan Baker: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/4/2021. Response Briefs due by 5/14/2021. Reply Briefs due by 5/18/2021. Hearing to be held on 5/20/2021. (Court Reporter Kelly McKee.) (pmh)
May 4, 2021 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/4/2021 04:00 PM in RSB Chambers before District Judge R. Stan Baker. (Dial-in information for conference call provided to counsel via email. pmh)For public access to this hearing, please dial 888-684-8852, and enter the call access code: 9717475.
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by One Hundred Miles. Responses due by 5/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 NC Final EA, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 SELC Letter, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 Goldberg et al. 2015, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 DNR Mem., #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 Norton Declaration, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 Dickerson et al. 2004, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7 WRD Letter, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8 CRD Letter, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9 SAFMC Letter, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10 Wickliffe et al. 2019, #11 Exhibit Ex. 11 SAD Turtle Protocol, #12 Exhibit Ex. 12 USACE Application & Notice to Bidders, #13 Exhibit Ex. 13 Excerpt from USACE RTA, #14 Exhibit Ex. 14 Industry Day Presentation, #15 Exhibit Ex. 15 Dredging Schedules, #16 Exhibit Ex. 16 Brunswick Harbor Deepening 1998 EIS, #17 Exhibit Ex. 17 NC Draft EA, #18 Exhibit Ex. 18 Nuse et al. 2020, #19 Exhibit Ex. 19 Ridley Declaration, #20 Exhibit Ex. 20 Bell Declaration, #21 Exhibit Ex. 21 Carroll Declaration, #22 Exhibit Ex. 22 Janssen Declaration)(Huynh, Megan). Added MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on 5/4/2021 (pts).
May 3, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by One Hundred Miles identifying N/A as Corporate Parent.. (Huynh, Megan)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by District Judge R. Stan Baker on 5/3/21. (wwp)
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Daniel Hibner, The United States Army Corps of Engineers, Attorney General, and United States Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(wwp)
May 3, 2021 Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number AGASDC - 3095864 (wwp) Modified on 5/3/2021 (wwp).
May 3, 2021 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Daniel Hibner, The United States Army Corps of Engineers, filed by One Hundred Miles. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wwp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: One Hundred Miles v. The United States Army Corps of Engineers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Kristofor Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colonel Daniel Hibner
Represented By: Otto Woelke Leithart
Represented By: Kristofor Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: One Hundred Miles
Represented By: Megan Hinkle Huynh
Represented By: Robert David Sherrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?