Hyton v. Titlemax Financing, Inc.
Petitioner: Marlene Hyton
Respondent: Titlemax Financing, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2021cv00163
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Georgia
Office: Savannah Office
Presiding Judge: William T Moore
Referring Judge: Christopher L Ray
Nature of Suit: Telephone Consumer Protection Act (TCPA)
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE to all counsel of record that a #1 Complaint was filed in the Southern District of Georgia. (wwp)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 26(f)ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 5/25/21. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (wwp)
May 25, 2021 Filing 13 Case transfer in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-20994. Case transferred electronically
May 25, 2021 Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Transfer Venue. The Clerk is therefore directed to transfer this case to the Southern District of Georgia, Savannah Division, where TitleMax is headquartered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 5/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
May 24, 2021 Civil Case Terminated per DE #12 Order. Closing Case. (mc)
May 24, 2021 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Transfer Venue by Marlene Hyton. (Kaufman, Avi)
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or in the Alternative, Its Motion for a More Definite Statement and to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Allegations by Titlemax Financing, Inc.. Responses due by 5/21/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Williston, Gillian)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #8 the Defendant's unopposed motion for an extension of time to respond to the complaint. The Defendant must file its response on or before May 7, 2021. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (kbe)
April 6, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Titlemax Financing, Inc.. Attorney Gillian DiFilippo Williston added to party Titlemax Financing, Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/20/2021 (Williston, Gillian)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 3/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Marlene Hyton. Titlemax Financing, Inc. served on 3/17/2021, answer due 4/7/2021. (Kaufman, Avi)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Titlemax Financing, Inc. (drz)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Venue on the Civil Cover Sheet does not match the initiating document. The Clerks Office confirmed Miami-Dade (Office - Miami) as the county with the filer. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Titlemax Financing, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14518527, filed by Marlene Hyton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Kaufman, Avi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Georgia Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyton v. Titlemax Financing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marlene Hyton
Represented By: Avi Robert Kaufman
Represented By: Rachel E Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Titlemax Financing, Inc.
Represented By: Gillian DiFilippo Williston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?